This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/21/2020 at 12:01:02 (UTC).

Finjan, Inc. v. Sonicwall, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 Finjan, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sonicwall, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00652

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Finjan, Inc.

Defendant

Sonicwall, Inc.

Respondent

Dell, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Jacqueline P. Altman

Attorney at Naman Howell Smith & Lee

400 Austin Avenue, Suite 800

Waco, TX 76701

John P. Palmer

Attorney at Naman Howell Smith & Lee

P.O. Box 1470

Waco, TX 76703-1470

Hannah Lee

Attorney at Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

990 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Shannon Hedvat

Attorney at Kramer Levin Naftalls & Frankel LLP

1177 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Gilbert Andrew Greene

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

900 S. Capital Of Texas Highway, Suite 300

Austin, TX 78746

Jennifer H. Forte

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30309-3929

Robin L. McGrath

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 2000

Atlanta, GA 30309

Respondent Attorney

Roger J. Fulghum

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

One Shell Plaza, 910 Louisiana

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

#28

RESTRICTED

#27

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Exhibit A

#14

13 #2

Proposed Order

13 #1

Exhibit A

1 #16

Proposed Order

1 #15

Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt

1 #14

Declaration of Shannon Hedvat

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #3

Exhibit 3

#1

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred: #1 Plaintiff's Expedited Opposed Motion to Compel Nonparty Dell, Inc. to Comply with Document and Deposition Subpoenas. (jv2) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #1 Plaintiffs' Expedited Opposed Motion to Compel Nonparty Dell, Inc. to Comply with Document and Deposition Subpoenas. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (jv2) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketPlease note that this case has been converted from a Miscellaneous case to a Civil case. Please use case number 1:20-cv-652-RP on all future filings. (jv2) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Hightower: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2020 re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Finjan, Inc. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Written Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter AT&T Conference Line.)(jv2) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER GRANTING #14 Jennifer H. Forte's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sonicwall, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER GRANTING #13 Robin McGrath's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sonicwall, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SUPPLEMENT to #18 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Dell, Inc., re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Finjan, Inc. by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fulghum, Roger) Modified on 7/1/2020 (jv2). (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #24 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Susan Hightower. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ssw) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Altman, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacqueline P. Altman for Shannon Hedvat by on behalf of Finjan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Altman, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order REFERRING #1 Motion to Compel entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that this motion is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacqueline P. Altman for Hannah Lee by on behalf of Finjan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Altman, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacqueline P. Altman for Hannah Lee ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13689011) (jv2) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacqueline P. Altman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13688960) (jv2) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacqueline P. Altman for Hannah Lee ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13689011) by on behalf of Finjan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Altman, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacqueline P. Altman for Shannon Hedvat ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13688960) by on behalf of Finjan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Altman, Jacqueline) Modified on 6/23/2020 (jv2). (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Compel ($47.00 Filing Fee 100038688) by Finjan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Declaration of Shannon Hedvat, #15 Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt, #16 Proposed Order)(cj) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sonicwall, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Finjan, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Dell Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roger Fulghum