This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2021 at 07:30:11 (UTC).

Finger v. Proofpoint, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Finger filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Proofpoint, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-04567

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Finger

Defendants

Jonathan Feiber

Dana Evan

Kevin Harvey

Proofpoint, Inc.

Elizabeth Rafael

Leyla Seka

Kristen Gil

Michael Johnson

Gary Steele

Richard Wallace

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel E. Elkins

Attorney at WeissLaw LLP

9100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 725 E.

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Susan Finger.. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 8/5/2021) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Dana Evan, Jonathan Feiber, Kristen Gil, Kevin Harvey, Michael Johnson, Proofpoint, Inc., Elizabeth Rafael, Leyla Seka, Gary Steele, Richard Wallace. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Susan Finger (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

2 #1

Summons List of Defendants

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons List of Defendants)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Dana Evan, Jonathan Feiber, Kristen Gil, Kevin Harvey, Michael Johnson, Proofpoint, Inc., Elizabeth Rafael, Leyla Seka, Gary Steele, Richard Wallace ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16074499.). Filed bySusan Finger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Susan Finger.. (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 8/5/2021) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docket(#8) SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/18/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/29/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Dana Evan, Jonathan Feiber, Kristen Gil, Kevin Harvey, Michael Johnson, Proofpoint, Inc., Elizabeth Rafael, Leyla Seka, Gary Steele, Richard Wallace. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Susan Finger (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons List of Defendants)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Dana Evan, Jonathan Feiber, Kristen Gil, Kevin Harvey, Michael Johnson, Proofpoint, Inc., Elizabeth Rafael, Leyla Seka, Gary Steele, Richard Wallace ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16074499.). Filed bySusan Finger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROOFPOINT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel E. Elkins