This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/17/2022 at 18:02:04 (UTC).

Finesse Wireless LLC v. Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Finesse Wireless LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00317

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Finesse Wireless LLC

Defendant

Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Intervenor Defendant

Nokia of America Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Bryce Thomas Barcelo

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Charles Everingham, IV

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Meng Xi

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Shawn Daniel Blackburn

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Thomas John Ward, Jr

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Megan Elise Griffith

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Joseph Samuel Grinstein

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Ross Ritter Barton

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP-NC

101 South Tryon Street, Ste 4000

Charlotte, NC 28280-4000

Adam Bertram Ahnhut

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP - Dallas

2200 Ross Ave., Suite 2300

Dallas, TX 75201

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, PC

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

M Joseph John Ravindra Fernando

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP-NC

101 South Tryon Street, Ste 4000

Charlotte, NC 28280-4000

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

David Aaron Nelson

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP - Chicago

500 West Madison Street, Suite 2450

Chicago, IL 60661

Scott Lamar Cole

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

201 West 5Th Street, 11Th Floor

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

22 #2

Text of Proposed Order

22 #1

Answer

#22

#21

15 #2

Revised Proposed Order

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #15 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Consolidation and Preliminary Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/15/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:21-cv- 00316. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/15/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Answer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Lamar Cole on behalf of Nokia of America Corporation (Cole, Scott) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Aaron Nelson on behalf of Nokia of America Corporation (Nelson, David) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Finesse Wireless LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless.(Barton, Ross) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless (Barton, Ross) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Finesse Wireless LLC. Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Consolidation and Preliminary Discovery Order by Finesse Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2021: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (kcv, ). (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Daniel Blackburn on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (Blackburn, Shawn) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meng Xi on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (Xi, Meng) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan Elise Griffith on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (Griffith, Megan) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Finesse Wireless LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8548621.), filed by Finesse Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Finesse Wireless LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Nokia of America Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott L. Cole