This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2021 at 09:20:40 (UTC).

Finesse Wireless LLC v. Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 Finesse Wireless LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00064

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Finesse Wireless LLC

Defendant

Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Samuel Grinstein

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Meng Xi

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Bryce Thomas Barcelo

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Thomas John Ward, Jr

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Charles Everingham, IV

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Shawn Daniel Blackburn

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Megan Elise Griffith

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, PC

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit 2 (U.S. Patent No. 9,548,775)

1 #2

Exhibit 1 (U.S. Patent No. 7,346,134)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned case is hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:21-cv-00063. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/16/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Change of Address by Meng Xi (Xi, Meng) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE by Finesse Wireless LLC NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless to 5/4/2021. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless.( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Daniel Blackburn on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (Blackburn, Shawn) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless to 4/19/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless.( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Finesse Wireless LLC. Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryce Thomas Barcelo on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (Barcelo, Bryce) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan Elise Griffith on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (Griffith, Megan) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meng Xi on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (Xi, Meng) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless c/o The Corporation Trust Company. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Finesse Wireless LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8262457.), filed by Finesse Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 (U.S. Patent No. 7,346,134), #3 Exhibit 2 (U.S. Patent No. 9,548,775))(Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Finesse Wireless LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deron R Dacus