Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2021 at 06:48:32 (UTC).

Finesse Wireless LLC v. AT&T Mobility LLC

Case Summary

On Feb 24th, 2021, the Plaintiff Finesse Wireless LLP (“Plaintiff” or “Finesse”), represented by Joseph S. Grinstein, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against AT&T MOBILITY LLC (“AT&T” or “Defendant”), for seeking damages and other reliefs for allegedly infringing one or more claims under patents owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of Texas, Marshall Division, with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding.

 

The Plaintiff alleged that the Defendant has infringed one or more claims under United States Patent Nos. 7,346,134 entitled “Radio Receiver.” (“’134 Patent”) and 9,548,775 entitled “Mitigation of transmitter passive and active IMPs in real and continuous time in the transmitter and co-located receiver.” (“’775 Patent”) (collectively, the “Asserted Patents”).

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that “AT&T operates and sells access to a mobile network that provides telecommunication, Internet service, and other services to customers via cellular base stations located in this district and throughout the United States (the “AT&T Base Stations”). The AT&T Base Stations incorporate technology that employs oversampling, signal isolation, and phase-shifting for cancellation of passive intermodulation (“PIM”) pursuant to the patented inventions.”

 

Plaintiff alleged that “the Asserted Patents recite novel and inventive systems and methods for the reduction and cancellation of PIM interference, including using a digital-signal processor-based approach in digital hardware to mitigate PIM on an on-going basis without the need for an on site technician. In other words, they use “cancelling” rather than “filtering” technology. Cancellation is a method that does not involve avoidance, manual fixes, frequency planning, or filtering—rather, cancellation deals directly with the resulting interference signals if and when they occur by attenuating them via cancellation techniques driven by the source signals.”

 

There are two claims for relief sought by the Plaintiff, one for the alleged infringement of one or more claims of the Asserted Patents. While describing the claims, Plaintiff alleged that AT&T has, without authorization, operated, used, and sold, and continues to operate, use, and sell, access to its 4G/LTE and 5G mobile network that includes the AT&T Base Stations (“’134 Accused Instrumentalities”)” and that “AT&T has indirectly infringed and continues to indirectly infringe the ’134 and ‘775 Patents in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271(b) by taking active steps to encourage and facilitate direct infringement by others, including OEMs, agent-subsidiaries, affiliates, partners, service providers, manufacturers, importers, resellers, customers, and/or end users, in this district and elsewhere in the United States and that AT&T’s alleged acts of infringement have caused and continue to cause damage to Finesse, and Finesse is entitled to recover from AT&T the damages it has sustained as a result of those wrongful acts in an amount subject to proof at trial.

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested the court to pass an order declaring that AT&T has infringed the Asserted Patents, contributed to the infringement of the Asserted Patents, and/or induced the infringement of the Asserted Patents. The Plaintiff further requested the court to pass an order for an injunctive relief in addition to the award of damages pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284 and costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00063

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Finesse Wireless LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

AT&T Mobility LLC

Ericsson Inc.

Intervenor Defendants and Counter Claimants

Ericsson Inc.

Nokia of America Corporation

Consolidated Defendant

Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Samuel Grinstein

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Meng Xi

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Bryce Thomas Barcelo

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Andrea Leigh Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Thomas John Ward, Jr

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Charles Everingham, IV

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Parkway

Longview, TX 75604

Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Megan Elise Griffith

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Shawn Daniel Blackburn

Attorney at Susman Godfrey, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant, Consolidated Defendant and Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, PC

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

Jeffery Scott Becker

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP - Dallas

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-2980

Douglas Mark Kubehl

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP - Dallas

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-2980

Brandon Chen

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP - Houston

One Shell Plaza, 910 Louisiana Street, 37Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Michelle Jacobson Eber

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP - Houston

One Shell Plaza, 910 Louisiana Street, 37Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Douglas Mark Kubehl

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP - Dallas

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-2980

Brianne McNicholas Straka

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP - Chicago

500 West Madison Street, Suite 2450

Chicago, IL 60661

David Aaron Nelson

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP - Chicago

500 West Madison Street, Suite 2450

Chicago, IL 60661

Defendant and Consolidated Defendant Attorneys

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, PC

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

M Joseph John Ravindra Fernando

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP-NC

101 South Tryon Street, Ste 4000

Charlotte, NC 28280-4000

Ross Ritter Barton

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP-NC

101 South Tryon Street, Ste 4000

Charlotte, NC 28280-4000

Adam Bertram Ahnhut

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP - Dallas

2200 Ross Ave., Suite 2300

Dallas, TX 75201

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#69

(#69) NOTICE by Nokia of America Corporation of P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Cole, Scott) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#68

(#68) Finesse's ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, for Verizon by Finesse Wireless LLC.(Griffith, Megan) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#67

(#67) Finesse's ANSWER to #52 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, for AT&T by Finesse Wireless LLC.(Griffith, Megan) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#66

(#66) NOTICE by Finesse Wireless LLC Notice of P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#65

(#65) NOTICE by Nokia of America Corporation of Disclosures (Cole, Scott) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#64

(#64) NOTICE by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless of Compliance (Barton, Ross) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#62

(#62) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order [#48] by Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#53

(#68) Finesse's ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, for Verizon by Finesse Wireless LLC.(Griffith, Megan) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#52

(#67) Finesse's ANSWER to #52 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, for AT&T by Finesse Wireless LLC.(Griffith, Megan) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan Elise Griffith on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (Griffith, Megan) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meng Xi on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (Xi, Meng) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC c/o Agent C T Corporation System. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Finesse Wireless LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit 2 (U.S. Patent No. 9,548,775)

1 #2

Exhibit 1 (U.S. Patent No. 7,346,134)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against AT&T Mobility LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8262435.), filed by Finesse Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 (U.S. Patent No. 7,346,134), #3 Exhibit 2 (U.S. Patent No. 9,548,775))(Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

84 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE by Nokia of America Corporation of P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Cole, Scott) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Finesse's ANSWER to #53 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, for Verizon by Finesse Wireless LLC.(Griffith, Megan) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Finesse's ANSWER to #52 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, for AT&T by Finesse Wireless LLC.(Griffith, Megan) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) NOTICE by Finesse Wireless LLC Notice of P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) NOTICE by Nokia of America Corporation of Disclosures (Cole, Scott) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless of Compliance (Barton, Ross) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #62 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order [#48]. Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2021., Jury Selection set for 3/21/2022 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Markman Hearing set for 10/29/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions due by 1/24/2022., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/7/2022.). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/23/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order [#48] by Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 61 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERNECE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, ) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT***Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order [#48] by Nokia of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott) Modified on 6/22/2021 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan Elise Griffith on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (Griffith, Megan) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meng Xi on behalf of Finesse Wireless LLC (Xi, Meng) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC c/o Agent C T Corporation System. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Finesse Wireless LLC (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against AT&T Mobility LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8262435.), filed by Finesse Wireless LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 (U.S. Patent No. 7,346,134), #3 Exhibit 2 (U.S. Patent No. 9,548,775))(Grinstein, Joseph) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ERICSSON INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nokia of America Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Mobility LLC is a litigant