This case was last updated from PACER on 08/12/2019 at 07:54:10 (UTC).

Fincher v. Cooper Hotel Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Fincher filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Cooper Hotel Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon A. York and J. Daniel Breen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01123

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jon A. York

Presiding Judge

J. Daniel Breen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Madelynn Fincher

Defendant

Cooper Hotel Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Caraline Elizabeth Rickard

Attorney at GILBERT RUSSELL MCWHERTER SCOTT & BOBBITT PLC

341 Cool Springs Blvd, Suite 230

Franklin, TN 37067

Justin Gilbert

Attorney at GILBERT MCWHERTER SCOTT BOBBTT PLC

100 W. Martin Luther King Blvd.,, Suite 501

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Defendant Attorneys

Shayna Giles

Attorney at BAKER, DONELSON, BEARMAN, CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ, PC-Memphis

165 Madison Avenue, Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

Angie C. Davis

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ

First Tennessee Bank Building, 165 Madison Avenue, Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CIVIL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 7/16/19. (ejc) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Madelynn Fincher (Gilbert, Justin) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #12 . Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 6/26/19. (skc) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension (Proposed Order Submitted) by Cooper Hotel Services, Inc.. (Davis, Angie) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Angie C. Davis on behalf of Cooper Hotel Services, Inc. (Davis, Angie) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Shayna Giles on behalf of Cooper Hotel Services, Inc. (Giles, Shayna) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Cooper Hotel Services, Inc. Notice of Appearance (Davis, Angie) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Caraline Elizabeth Rickard on behalf of Madelynn Fincher (Rickard, Caraline) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Cooper Hotel Services, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (cdi) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#2

(#2) Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (cdi) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Cooper Hotel Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3090428), filed by Madelynn Fincher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gilbert, Justin) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CIVIL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 7/16/19. (ejc) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Madelynn Fincher (Gilbert, Justin) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference RESET TO 8/15/2019 10:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please see previous Setting Letter for instructions. (ars) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #12 . Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 6/26/19. (skc) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension (Proposed Order Submitted) by Cooper Hotel Services, Inc.. (Davis, Angie) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • (#11) SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 07/24/2019, 10:00 A.M. CT in Courtroom #3, 3rd Floor, Jackson Federal Courthouse, before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. All Scheduling Conferences will be done in person before the Court. If you are unable to appear at this time, or if you need to make alternative arrangements, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.doc Note that this is a NEW scheduling order template on which all scheduling orders will now be based. Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Angie C. Davis on behalf of Cooper Hotel Services, Inc. (Davis, Angie) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Shayna Giles on behalf of Cooper Hotel Services, Inc. (Giles, Shayna) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Cooper Hotel Services, Inc. Notice of Appearance (Davis, Angie) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Caraline Elizabeth Rickard on behalf of Madelynn Fincher (Rickard, Caraline) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Cooper Hotel Services, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (cdi) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (cdi) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (cdi) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cdi) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (cdi) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Cooper Hotel Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3090428), filed by Madelynn Fincher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gilbert, Justin) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.