This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:53:30 (UTC).

Finch v. Wilson County et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Finch filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Wilson County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00550

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Ray Finch

Defendants

John H. Watters

Tony McCoy Owens

Wilson County

Sheriff Calvin L. Woodard, Jr.

Alan H. McMahan

James Tant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David S. Rudolf

Attorney at Rudolf, Widenhouse

225 East Worthington Ave, Suite 100

Charlotte, NC 28203

Sonya Pfeiffer

Attorney at Rudolf Widenhouse

225 E. Worthington Ave., Suite 200

Charlotte, NC 28203

Phillip E. Lewis

Attorney at Rudolf Widenhouse

225 E. Worthington Ave., Suite 100

Charlotte, NC 28203

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan G. Nichols

Attorney at North Carolina Department of Justice

114 W. Edenton Street

Raleigh, NC 27603

Alex Ryan Williams

Attorney at NC Department of Justice

114 W. Edenton St.

Raleigh, NC 27603

Tom Slade Rand, Jr.

Attorney at Slade Rand Attorney At Law

2514 Nash St., North, P. O. Drawer 3299

Wilson, NC 27895-3299

Stephen Levi Beaman

Attorney at Stephen L. Beaman, PLLC

Po Box 1907

Wilson, NC 27894-1907

 

Court Documents

33 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#33

(#33) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Tony McCoy Owens, James Tant, Wilson County, Calvin L. Woodard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Beaman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

32 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#32

(#32) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Alan H. McMahan, John H. Watters. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Williams, Alex) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#31

(#31) Notice of Appearance filed by Bryan G. Nichols on behalf of Alan H. McMahan, John H. Watters. (Nichols, Bryan) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#30

(#30) Notice of Appearance filed by Alex Ryan Williams on behalf of Alan H. McMahan, John H. Watters. (Williams, Alex) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#29

(#29) Affidavit of Service for Summons, Complaint filed by Charles Ray Finch served on Alan H. McMahan on 01/03/2020. (Rudolf, David) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#28

(#28) Financial Disclosure Statement by Wilson County (Beaman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#27

(#27) Financial Disclosure Statement by Calvin L. Woodard, Jr (Beaman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Wilson County, Calvin L. Woodard, Jr. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) Notice filed by Charles Ray Finch Summons - Calvin L. Woodard, Jr... (Rudolf, David) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice filed by Charles Ray Finch Summons - Wilson County. (Rudolf, David) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Phillip E. Lewis on behalf of Charles Ray Finch. (Lewis, Phillip) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by David S. Rudolf on behalf of Charles Ray Finch. (Rudolf, David) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Sonya Pfeiffer on behalf of Charles Ray Finch. (Pfeiffer, Sonya) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice filed by Charles Ray Finch Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations. (Rudolf, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

TEXT ORDER granting the Consent Motion for Extension of Time #32 filed by Defendants Alan McMahan and John Watters and the Joint Motion for Extension of Time #33 filed by Defendants Wilson County, Sheriff Calvin L. Woodard, Jr., Tony McCoy Owens, and James Tant. For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that Defendants McMahan and Watters have up to and including March 24, 2020, and Defendants Wilson County, Woodard, Owens and Tant have up to and including April 10, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/27/2020. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting the Consent Motion for Extension of Time #32 filed by Defendants Alan McMahan and John Watters and the Joint Motion for Extension of Time #33 filed by Defendants Wilson County, Sheriff Calvin L. Woodard, Jr., Tony McCoy Owens, and James Tant. For good cause shown and with the consent of Plaintiff, it is ordered that Defendants McMahan and Watters have up to and including March 24, 2020, and Defendants Wilson County, Woodard, Owens and Tant have up to and including April 10, 2020, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/27/2020. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Tony McCoy Owens, James Tant, Wilson County, Calvin L. Woodard, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Beaman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Alan H. McMahan, John H. Watters. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Williams, Alex) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Notice of Appearance filed by Bryan G. Nichols on behalf of Alan H. McMahan, John H. Watters. (Nichols, Bryan) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Notice of Appearance filed by Alex Ryan Williams on behalf of Alan H. McMahan, John H. Watters. (Williams, Alex) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Affidavit of Service for Summons, Complaint filed by Charles Ray Finch served on Alan H. McMahan on 01/03/2020. (Rudolf, David) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Financial Disclosure Statement by Wilson County (Beaman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Financial Disclosure Statement by Calvin L. Woodard, Jr (Beaman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen Levi Beaman on behalf of Wilson County. (Beaman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Wilson County, Calvin L. Woodard, Jr. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice filed by Charles Ray Finch Summons - Calvin L. Woodard, Jr... (Rudolf, David) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice filed by Charles Ray Finch Summons - Wilson County. (Rudolf, David) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Phillip E. Lewis on behalf of Charles Ray Finch. (Lewis, Phillip) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by David S. Rudolf on behalf of Charles Ray Finch. (Rudolf, David) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - All Counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Sonya Pfeiffer on behalf of Charles Ray Finch. (Pfeiffer, Sonya) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice filed by Charles Ray Finch Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations. (Rudolf, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5208362.), filed by Charles Ray Finch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rudolf, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.