This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2020 at 07:46:19 (UTC).

Finch v. Davidson County Sheriff Dept.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 Finch filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Davidson County Sheriff Dept. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00033

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nathan Finch

Nashville, TN 37219-6383

Respondent

Davidson County Sheriff Dept.

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER: Petitioner MUST, within 28 DAYS of the date this Order is entered on the docket, either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner's submission must include the assigned case number, No. 3:20-cv-00033. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Petitioner a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/23/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (Pro se party sent blank IFP (short) form.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) Modified Text on 1/24/2020 (am). (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#4

(#4) Regular Mail Returned to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward, Not Here. #3 Order. Mail sent to Nathan Finch (am) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nathan Finch.(afs) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Regular Mail Returned to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward, Not Here. #3 Order. Mail sent to Nathan Finch (am) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Petitioner MUST, within 28 DAYS of the date this Order is entered on the docket, either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner's submission must include the assigned case number, No. 3:20-cv-00033. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Petitioner a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/23/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (Pro se party sent blank IFP (short) form.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am) Modified Text on 1/24/2020 (am). (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket(Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (afs) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (afs) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nathan Finch.(afs) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.