This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2019 at 10:44:17 (UTC).

Finch et al v. American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida

Case Summary

On 04/17/2019 Finch filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Julie S. Sneed and Mary S. Scriven. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00915

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kyle Schemitsch

Jacquelyn Finch

Defendant

American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Low

Attorney at David Low & Associates, P.A.

2101 W Commercial Blvd Ste 2800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309-3070

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph H. Picone

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, P.A.

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1900

Tampa, FL 33602-5148

Brian H. Koch

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

401 E Las Olas Blvd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301-4223

William R. Clayton

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

401 E Las Olas Blvd

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301-4223

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/20/2019. (GMD) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Koch, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#7

(#7) SHOW CAUSE ORDER. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to show cause within seven (7) days from the date of this Order why Defendant's Motion to Dismiss should not be granted. Failure to respond will result in the Court's considering the motion to be unopposed and may result in the dismissal of Plaintiffs' action without further notice from the Court. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/13/2019. (GMD) (GMD). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida identifying Corporate Parent Interfinancial, Inc., Other Affiliate Assurant Inc. for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida.. (Koch, Brian) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#5

(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/10/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/26/2019. (KTT) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/10/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/26/2019. (KTT) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

3 #1

Declaration Page for SFIP Listed in Complaint

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss Petition and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Page for SFIP Listed in Complaint)(Koch, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 2

1 #3

State Court Other Documents Exhibit 1

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT Petition for Declaratory Relief

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, Fl case number 19-CA-002534 filed in State Court on 3/11/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15366103 filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Petition for Declaratory Relief, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Picone, Joseph) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/20/2019. (GMD) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Koch, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SHOW CAUSE ORDER. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to show cause within seven (7) days from the date of this Order why Defendant's Motion to Dismiss should not be granted. Failure to respond will result in the Court's considering the motion to be unopposed and may result in the dismissal of Plaintiffs' action without further notice from the Court. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/13/2019. (GMD) (GMD). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida identifying Corporate Parent Interfinancial, Inc., Other Affiliate Assurant Inc. for American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida.. (Koch, Brian) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/10/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/26/2019. (KTT) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/10/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/26/2019. (KTT) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss Petition and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Page for SFIP Listed in Complaint)(Koch, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-915-T-35JSS. (SJB) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, Fl case number 19-CA-002534 filed in State Court on 3/11/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15366103 filed by American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Petition for Declaratory Relief, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Picone, Joseph) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Picone

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William R. Clayton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian Howard Koch