This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 11:08:48 (UTC).

Finance Committee of the Board of Directors of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan et al v. Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Finance Committee of the Board of Directors of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Allianz Global Investors U S LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03276

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Finance Committee of the Board of Directors of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan

Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation

Defendant

Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Zachary Goldman

Attorney at Petrillo Klein LLP

655 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Adam L. Hoeflich

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP

54 W. Hubbard Street, Ste 300

Chicago, IL 60654

Dawson K. Robinson

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP

54 W. Hubbard St., Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60654

Mark Shawn Ouweleen

Attorney at Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP

54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60610

Sean W. Gallagher

Attorney at Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP (IL)

54 West Hubbard Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60654

Abby M Mollen

Attorney at Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP

54 W. Hubbard Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60654

Nicolas Martinez

Attorney at Bartlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP

54 West Hubbard, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60654

Defendant Attorneys

Ann-Elizabeth Ostrager

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Mary Elizabeth Brust

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP (NYC)

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Stephanie G Wheeler

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

William T Davison

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP (MA)

800 Boylston St

Boston, MA 02199

Amy D. Roy

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

800 Boylston

Boston, MA 02199

Cole A Goodman

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

Prudential Tower, 800 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02199

Robert Joseph Giuffra, Jr.

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Kathleen Suzanne McArthur

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Jacob Michael Croke

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Hilary M. Williams

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP (NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Robert A. Skinner

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP (MA)

800 Boylston St

Boston, MA 02199

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #31 Motion for Abby M. Mollen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 31. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/3/2021) (rro) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#36

(#36) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #28 Motion for William Davison to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 28. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (rj) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#35

(#35) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 25. So ordered. Granting #25 Motion for Adam L. Hoeflich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (rjm) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#34

(#34) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #27 Motion for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 27. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (rro) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#33

(#33) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #29 Motion for Cole Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 29. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (rro) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#32

(#32) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #26 Motion for Amy D. Roy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 26. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (rro) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#31

(#31) MOTION for Abby M. Mollen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24475002. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Finance Committee of the Board of Directors of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan..(Mollen, Abby) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#29

>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for Cole Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24473214. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#28

(#36) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #28 Motion for William Davison to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 28. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (rj) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#27

(#34) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #27 Motion for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 27. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (rro) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#26

(#32) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #26 Motion for Amy D. Roy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 26. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (rro) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#25

(#35) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 25. So ordered. Granting #25 Motion for Adam L. Hoeflich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (rjm) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Finance Committee of the Board of Directors of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan..(Goldman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation..(Goldman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Finance Committee of the Board of Directors of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan..(Goldman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20 Civ. 7606. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Finance Committee of the Board of Directors of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan..(Goldman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#2

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel Zachary Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Multiple natures of suit were selected. Choose one. (pc) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#1

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Finance Committee of the Board of Directors of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan..(Goldman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #31 Motion for Abby M. Mollen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 31. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/3/2021) (rro) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #28 Motion for William Davison to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 28. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (rj) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 25. So ordered. Granting #25 Motion for Adam L. Hoeflich to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (rjm) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #27 Motion for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 27. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (rro) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #29 Motion for Cole Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 29. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (rro) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE granting #26 Motion for Amy D. Roy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 26. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2021) (rro) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #31 MOTION for Abby M. Mollen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24475002. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION for Abby M. Mollen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24475002. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Finance Committee of the Board of Directors of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan..(Mollen, Abby) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #29 MOTION for Cole Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24473214. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Elizabeth Brust on behalf of Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC..(Brust, Mary) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Katherine Polk Failla as possibly related to 20cv7606. (pc) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel Zachary Goldman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Multiple natures of suit were selected. Choose one. (pc) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Finance Committee of the Board of Directors of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan..(Goldman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation..(Goldman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Finance Committee of the Board of Directors of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan..(Goldman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 20 Civ. 7606. Document filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation, Finance Committee of the Board of Directors of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan..(Goldman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Goldman, Daniel) Modified on 4/15/2021 (pc). (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24400167)Document filed by Finance Committee of the Board of Directors of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Foundation..(Goldman, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allianz Global Investors U.S. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Minnesota is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Croke