This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2019 at 08:03:27 (UTC).

Filson v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2019 Filson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00946

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Lester Filson

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John A Dalimonte

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP

85 Devonshire St., Ste. 1000

Boston, MA 02109

Paul Lincoln Stoller

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller, LLP

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 500

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Charles Silvestri Higgins

Attorney at Burch, Porter & Johnson, PLLC

130 N Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Lani D. Lester

Attorney at Burch, Porter & Johnson, PLLC

130 N Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP

201 Seventeenth Street, Nw, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Shane G. Ramsey

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP (Nashville Office)

One Nashville Place, 150 Fourth Avenue, North, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37219

Dell P. Chappell

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP (Columbia SC Office)

1320 Main Street, Suite 1700

Columbia, SC 29201

Eric A. Paine

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP (Columbia SC Office)

1320 Main Street, Suite 1700

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Lani D. Lester on behalf of John Lester Filson (Lester, Lani) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Silvestri Higgins on behalf of John Lester Filson (Higgins, Charles) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

12 #1

Attachment USDC Certificate of Good Standing

#12

(#12) MOTION for attorney Eric A. Paine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3030063) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment USDC Certificate of Good Standing)(Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION for attorney Dell P. Chappell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3030052) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment USDC Certificate of Good Standing)(Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#9

(#9) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#8

(#8) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#7

No Description Available

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 2:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Shane G. Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

4 #1

*Restricted*

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15670771 filed by John Lester Filson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.] (Entered: 06/28/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Civil Case Terminated per #13 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. No Order to enter. (dt) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Lani D. Lester on behalf of John Lester Filson (Lester, Lani) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Silvestri Higgins on behalf of John Lester Filson (Higgins, Charles) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • SC State Bar status verified as active for Dell P. Chappell, Eric A. Paine. (jw) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for attorney Eric A. Paine to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3030063) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment USDC Certificate of Good Standing)(Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for attorney Dell P. Chappell to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3030052) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment USDC Certificate of Good Standing)(Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: Case Management Conference RESET for 11/21/2019 at 01:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/12/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by C R Bard Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated. (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 2:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • NOTICE TO COUNSEL Richard B. North, Jr, Paul Lincoln Stoller, and John A Dalimonte: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/15/2019. (mg) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • GA State Bar status verified as active for Richard B. North, Jr, AZ State Bar status verified as active for Paul Lincoln Stoller, and MA State Bar status verified as active for John A Dalimonte. (mg) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Shane G. Ramsey. (mg) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Shane G. Ramsey on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Ramsey, Shane) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case transferred in from the District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-02043. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Remark: Case transferred to the Middle District of Tennessee via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.] (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-2043-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.] (Entered: 06/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15670771 filed by John Lester Filson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.] (Entered: 06/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Silvestri Higgins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul L. Stoller