This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2022 at 08:43:12 (UTC).

Fiffie v. Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 Fiffie filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah S. Vance and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00466

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah S. Vance

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alvin Fiffie

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Eagle, Inc.

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Travelers Casualty and Surety Company

Cajun Company

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Eagle Asbestos & Packing Co., Inc.

McCarty Corporation

Anco Insulations, Inc.

Caire and Graugnard of Louisiana, LLC

Caire and Graugnard

River Parish Maintenance, Inc.

Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.

Avondale Industries

Aetna Casualty & Surety Company

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Union Carbide Corporation

Occidental Chemical Corporation

IMTT-Geismar

Cajun Insulation Company

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mickey P. Landry

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Frank J. Swarr

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Matthew C. Clark

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Philip C Hoffman

Attorney at Philip C. Hoffman, LLC

643 Magazine Street, Suite 300 A

New Orleans, LA 70130

James Vincent Campbell

1015 Locust Street, Suite 1200

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Susan Beth Kohn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

April Ann McQuillar

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Douglas Kinler

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Douglas Watson Redfearn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Brian C. Bossier

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Christopher Thomas Grace, III

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Erin Helen Boyd

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Laura M. Gillen

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Whitney Charmaine Stewart

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP

3421 N Causeway Blvd, Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Christopher Kelly Lightfoot

Attorney at Hailey, McNamara, Hall, Larmann & Papale, LLP (Metairie)

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001-8288

Edward J. Lassus, Jr.

Attorney at Hailey, McNamara, Hall, Larmann & Papale, LLP (Metairie)

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001-8288

Gabriel J. Veninata

Attorney at Hailey, McNamara, Hall, Larmann & Papale, LLP (Metairie)

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001-8288

Other Attorneys

Margaret M. Joffe

Attorney at Cosmich Simmons & Brown, PLLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2215

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kenan Slade Rand, Jr

Attorney at Cosmich Simmons & Brown, PLLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2215

New Orleans, LA 70130

38 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company for Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company (Adams, Desiree) Modified text/corporate parents on 4/19/2022 (mm). (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#27

(#27) ORDER granting #26 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Francis Christopher Cannone for Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/11/2022. (mm) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

26 #1

Proposed Order

26 #26

Main Document

#25

(#25) ORDER granting #21 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney James Vincent Campbell for Alvin Fiffie. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/1/2022. (mm) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#24

(#24) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Huntington Ingalls, Inc.'s Cross-Claims and Third-Party Demands by Union Carbide Corporation.(St. Julien, Milele) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#23

(#23) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation (St. Julien, Milele) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

21 #1

Proposed Order

21 #21

Main Document

5 #3

State Court Pleadings

5 #2

State Court Pleadings

5 #1

State Court Pleadings

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Cross-Claims by Anco Insulations, Inc. Attorney Margaret M. Joffe added to party Anco Insulations, Inc.(pty:dft).(Joffe, Margaret) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#3

(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (lw) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

1 #3

State Court Pleadings

1 #2

State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #28 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **1. Document lists counsel of record, Jared A. Davidson, for a party in this action who has not been enrolled in this matter. Future filings which list attorneys not enrolled will not be accepted. Please file a motion and order to enroll additional counsel. 2. Filing attorney incorrectly entered Stonewall Insurance Co instead of Berkshire Hathaway Inc. as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company for Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company (Adams, Desiree) Modified text/corporate parents on 4/19/2022 (mm). (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #26 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Francis Christopher Cannone for Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/11/2022. (mm) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Francis C. Cannone by Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association(legal successor to Houston General Insurance Company and Lamorak Insurane Company for the liability of Eagle, Inc. ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosamond, Samuel) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting #21 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney James Vincent Campbell for Alvin Fiffie. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/1/2022. (mm) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Huntington Ingalls, Inc.'s Cross-Claims and Third-Party Demands by Union Carbide Corporation.(St. Julien, Milele) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation (St. Julien, Milele) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition for Damages by Union Carbide Corporation.Attorney Milele N. St. Julien added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft).(St. Julien, Milele) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record James V. Campbell by Alvin Fiffie. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Swarr, Frank) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Shell Oil Corp identifying Corporate Parent Shell Petroleum Inc., Corporate Parent Shell Petroleum N.V., Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell plc for Shell Oil Corp (Semlinger, Lauren) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company.(Adams, Desiree) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Huntington Ingalls, Inc.'s Cross-Claim by Caire and Graugnard of Louisiana, LLC.Attorney Lawrence Pugh, III added to party Caire and Graugnard of Louisiana, LLC(pty:crd).(Pugh, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand and Avondale's Third Party Demand by First State Insurance Company.(Holmes, James) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Anco Insulations, Inc. (Rand, Kenan) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Caire and Graugnard of Louisiana, LLC (Pugh, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Compliance with Court's Directive by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 State Court Pleadings)(Boyd, Erin) Modified text on 3/9/2022 (lw). (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Cross-Claims by Anco Insulations, Inc. Attorney Margaret M. Joffe added to party Anco Insulations, Inc.(pty:dft).(Joffe, Margaret) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (lw) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2021-07575, C-10 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9245039) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Erin Helen Boyd added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Boyd, Erin) Modified text on 2/23/2022 (lw). (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Avondale Industries, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Cajun Company is a litigant