This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2020 at 07:32:31 (UTC).

Fields v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Fields filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric F. Melgren. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-01319

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric F. Melgren

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Niccole Fields

Defendant

Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Interested Party

Social Security Regional Administrator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathleen E. Overton

Attorney at Parmele Law Firm, PC - Springfield

1505 E. Bradford Parkway

Springfield, MO 65804

Defendant Attorney

Michelle A. Jacobs

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney - Wichita

301 North Main Street, Suite 1200

Wichita, KS 67202-4812

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#9

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD - Certified copy of transcript of record re #9 Answer to Complaint by Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of. (Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of.(Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney General served by Certified Mail on 12/4/2019. (jk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Returned Executed -- Office of the Regional Counsel served by Certified Mail on 12/2/2019. (jk) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Returned Executed -- United States Attorney served by Personal Service on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (jk) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service). (jk) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Plaintiff(s) or plaintiff(s) counsel directed to IMMEDIATELY prepare and submit summon(s) to the Clerk for service. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 11/26/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Niccole Fields (Overton, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Niccole Fields - trial to be held in Wichita. (Overton, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Niccole Fields. (Overton, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Niccole Fields.(Overton, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.