This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/17/2022 at 08:27:39 (UTC).

Fields v. Marla's Community Living Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 Fields filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Marla's Community Living Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00021

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robbie Fields

Defendants

Marla's Community Living Services LLC

Darla Carrasco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Theodore Carl Anderson, III

Attorney at Kilgore & Kilgore PLLC

3109 Carlisle, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75204

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Robbie Fields. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12606622) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robbie Fields. (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (krr) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Robbie Fields. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

4 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Summons' Issued as to All Defendants. (krr) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#7

(#7) Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Robbie Fields (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER: The Court, having considered the Parties Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer Original Complaint, filed March 21, 2022, is of the opinion that the same should be GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants deadline in which to file an answer or otherwise respond is hereby EXTENDED to April 1, 2022. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 3/22/2022) (krr) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#9

(#9) Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Robbie Fields. (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all claims asserted in the above-styled and-numbered civil action are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJIUDICE with costs taxed against the party incurring the same. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 4/6/2022) (krr) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#11

(#11) JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the above-styled and -numberedcivil action be DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 4/6/2022) (krr) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the above-styled and -numberedcivil action be DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 4/6/2022) (krr) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all claims asserted in the above-styled and-numbered civil action are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJIUDICE with costs taxed against the party incurring the same. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 4/6/2022) (krr) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Robbie Fields. (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: The Court, having considered the Parties Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer Original Complaint, filed March 21, 2022, is of the opinion that the same should be GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants deadline in which to file an answer or otherwise respond is hereby EXTENDED to April 1, 2022. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R. Cummings on 3/22/2022) (krr) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Robbie Fields (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons' Issued as to All Defendants. (krr) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Robbie Fields. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (krr) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robbie Fields. (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Robbie Fields. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12606622) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Anderson, Theodore) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Theodore Carl Anderson, III