This case was last updated from PACER on 04/11/2021 at 09:51:04 (UTC).

Fields v. Kindred at Home Foundation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 Fields filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Kindred at Home Foundation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Glen H. Davidson and David A. Sanders. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Glen H. Davidson

Referral Judge

David A. Sanders

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bridgette N. Fields

Defendant

Kindred at Home Foundation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Shane McLaughlin

Attorney at MCLAUGHLIN LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 200

Tupelo, MS 38802

Defendant Attorney

Susan Fahey Desmond

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS LLP - New Orleans

650 Poydras Street Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss; CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/31/2021. (jtm) Modified on 4/1/2021 (jla).

#4

(#4) Joint MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration by Kindred at Home Foundation, Inc.. (Desmond, Susan)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Bridgette N. Fields Kindred at Home Foundation, Inc. served on 3/3/2021. (McLaughlin, Richard)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Kindred at Home Foundation, Inc.; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue

1 #1

Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1906994, filed by Bridgette N. Fields. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Dismiss; CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/31/2021. (jtm) Modified on 4/1/2021 (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint MOTION to Dismiss in Favor of Arbitration by Kindred at Home Foundation, Inc.. (Desmond, Susan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Bridgette N. Fields Kindred at Home Foundation, Inc. served on 3/3/2021. (McLaughlin, Richard)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Kindred at Home Foundation, Inc.; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1906994, filed by Bridgette N. Fields. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KINDRED AT HOME is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Shane McLaughlin