This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2019 at 09:06:13 (UTC).

Field v. PNC Bank, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 Field filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against PNC Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH J. MANSFIELD and LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00573

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

Presiding Judge

LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dane S. Field

Defendants

Michael Alden Smith

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

PNC Bank, N.A.

In Re

In The Matter Of:

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Van-Alan H. Shima

Attorney at Affinity Law Group

1188 Bishop St. Ste 3408, 545-4600, Fax: 5454601

Honolulu, HI 96813

John F. Perkin

Attorney at Perkin & Faria

841 Bishop Street, Suite 1000, 523-2300, Fax: 697-5304

Honolulu, HI 96813

Bridget G. Morgan-Bickerton

Attorney at Bickerton Law Group LLLP

745 Fort St Ste 801

Honolulu, HI 96813

James J. Bickerton

Attorney at Bickerton Law Group LLLP

745 Fort St Ste 801, 599-3811

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorneys

Summer H. Kaiawe

Attorney at Watanabe Ing LLP

999 Bishop St Suite 1250, 544-8300

Honolulu, HI 96813

Thomas H.Y.P. Yee

Attorney at Watanabe Ing LLP

999 Bishop St., Suite 1250, Honolulu

Honolulu, HI 96813

Michael C. Bird

Attorney at Watanabe Ing LLP

999 Bishop St Suite 1250, 544-8300

Honolulu, HI 96813

Nicholas R. Monlux

Attorney at Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

999 Bishop St Ste 2600, 535-5700

Honolulu, HI 96813-3889

David M. Louie

Attorney at Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

999 Bishop St Ste 2600, 535-5700, Fax: 535-5799

Honolulu, HI 96813-3889

Jesse W. Schiel

Attorney at Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

999 Bishop St Ste 2600, 539-8700

Honolulu, HI 96813-3889

Lauren K. Chun

Attorney at Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel LLLP

999 Bishop St Ste 1600

Honolulu, HI 96813

Brett J. Natarelli

Attorney at Manatt Phelps & Phillips

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2600

Chicago, IL 60606

Richard E. Gottlieb

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2600

Chicago, IL 60606

Arthur F. Radke

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2600

Chicago, IL 60606

Edmund K. Saffery

Attorney at Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel LLLP

999 Bishop St Ste 1600, 547-5600

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dane S. Field (Re: 1) Plaintiff Trustee's Responses and Objections to PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Dated November 1, 2019, 2) Plaintiff Trustee's Responses and Objections to PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Admissions to Plaintiff Dated November 1, 2019, and 3) Plaintiff Trustee's Responses and Objections to PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Dated November 1, 2019} (Bickerton, James) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

21 #1

Certificate of Service

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse W. Schiel on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schiel, Jesse) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

20 #1

Certificate of Service

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse W. Schiel on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A. on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schiel, Jesse) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

19 #1

Certificate of Service

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas R. Monlux (David M. Louie, Jesse W. Schiel, Nicholas R. Monlux) on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Monlux, Nicholas) Modified on 11/22/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance of Co-Counsel by Nicholas R. Monlux (David M. Louie, Jesse W. Schiel and Nicholas R. Monlux) on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A. on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A.. (Monlux, Nicholas) Modified on 11/22/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#17

(#17) RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/21/2019. (emt, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Arthur F. Radke Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2286497.Edmund K. Saffery appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Saffery, Edmund) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Richard E. Gottlieb Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2286492.Lauren K. Chun appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Chun, Lauren) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice For Brett J. Natarelli, ESQ. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2286488.Lauren K. Chun appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Chun, Lauren) Modified on 11/6/2019 (apg, ). (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PNC Bank, N.A. RE: PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Chun, Lauren) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PNC Bank, N.A. RE: PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff (Chun, Lauren) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PNC Bank, N.A. RE: PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Chun, Lauren) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

3 #1

Certificate of Service re: Notice of Appearance of Counsel

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund K. Saffery on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A. on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service re: Notice of Appearance of Counsel)(Saffery, Edmund) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dane S. Field (Re: 1) Plaintiff Trustee's Responses and Objections to PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Dated November 1, 2019, 2) Plaintiff Trustee's Responses and Objections to PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Admissions to Plaintiff Dated November 1, 2019, and 3) Plaintiff Trustee's Responses and Objections to PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Dated November 1, 2019} (Bickerton, James) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse W. Schiel on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schiel, Jesse) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse W. Schiel on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A. on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schiel, Jesse) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ADVISORY ENTRY. Please be advised that the Notices of Appearance, ECF Nos. #18 and #19 , filed by PNC Bank, N.A. and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, reflect the appearance of multiple attorneys. To ensure that each attorney is properly associated to the case, it is recommended that individual Notices of Appearance be filed by each attorney using their own CM/ECF login credentials. (emt, ) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas R. Monlux (David M. Louie, Jesse W. Schiel, Nicholas R. Monlux) on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Monlux, Nicholas) Modified on 11/22/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance of Co-Counsel by Nicholas R. Monlux (David M. Louie, Jesse W. Schiel and Nicholas R. Monlux) on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A. on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A.. (Monlux, Nicholas) Modified on 11/22/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/21/2019. (emt, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. Bird on behalf of Michael Alden Smith on behalf of Michael Alden Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bird, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) EP: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Counsel Zachary Kondo specially appearing on behalf of Defendant Federal Home Loans Mortgage Corporation. Counsel David Louie appearing on behalf of Defendants PNC Bank and Federal Home Loans Mortgage Corporation. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 11/16/2020 in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/6/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference is set for 8/12/2020 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions Deadline N/A. Discovery Deadline N/A.Court to issue a Scheduling Order.(FTR-Ctrm C6 9:45 - 9:49.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Alden Smith Re: JOINDER in (1) PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff dated November 1, 2019, (2) PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff dated November 1, 2019, and (3) PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Interrogatoires to Plaintiff dated November 1, 2019 (Kaiawe, Summer) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, Arthur F. Radke appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A, signed by JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (apg, ) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Arthur F. Radke Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2286497.Edmund K. Saffery appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Saffery, Edmund) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Richard E. Gottlieb Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2286492.Lauren K. Chun appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Chun, Lauren) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice For Brett J. Natarelli, ESQ. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2286488.Lauren K. Chun appearing for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Chun, Lauren) Modified on 11/6/2019 (apg, ). (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PNC Bank, N.A. RE: PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Chun, Lauren) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PNC Bank, N.A. RE: PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff (Chun, Lauren) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PNC Bank, N.A. RE: PNC Bank, N.A.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff (Chun, Lauren) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund K. Saffery on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A. on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service re: Notice of Appearance of Counsel)(Saffery, Edmund) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00573 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Transmittal to District Court from U.S. Bankruptcy Court Re: Bankruptcy Judge's Recommendation to Withdraw Reference (Schedule Jury Trial), Case No. 17-00585, A.P. No. 19-90024. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, Adversary Proceeding # 19-90024, #2 Recommendation to District Court to Withdraw Reference to Schedule Jury Trial) (emt, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Van-Alan H. Shima

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F. Perkin