This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2022 at 08:04:00 (UTC).

Fieger v. Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 Fieger filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Hard Rock Cafe International USA , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas R. Cole and Karen L. Litkovitz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00297

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas R. Cole

Referral Judge

Karen L. Litkovitz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly Fieger

Defendants

Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc.

Hard Rock Cafe, Inc. Health Benefit Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jack Frederick Fuchs

7700 Ashley View Drive

Cincinnati, OH 45227

Defendant Attorneys

Chad Ellis Willits

Attorney at Reminger Co., LPA

525 Vine Street, Ste. 1700

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Michael Joseph Caligaris

Attorney at Reminger Co. LPA - Cleveland

525 Vine Street, Ste 1500

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kelly Fieger. (Attachments: #1 Supplement -Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-Proffered Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet -Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3-Summons for Plan, #5 Exhibit 4-Summons for Hard Rock, #6 Exhibit 5-Marshals Form for Hard Rock, #7 Exhibit 6-Marshals Form for Plan, #8 Exhibit 7-Proffered Order) (Fuchs, Jack) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

1 #1

Supplement -Memorandum in Support

1 #2

Exhibit 1-Proffered Complaint

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet -Exhibit 2

1 #4

Exhibit 3-Summons for Plan

1 #5

Exhibit 4-Summons for Hard Rock

1 #6

Exhibit 5-Marshals Form for Hard Rock

1 #7

Exhibit 6-Marshals Form for Plan

1 #8

Exhibit 7-Proffered Order

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 05/27/2022. (bjc) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc., Hard Rock Cafe, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, filed by Kelly Fieger. (bjc). Modified To Replace Document on 5/27/2022 (bjc). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc., Hard Rock Cafe, Inc. Health Benefit Plan and sent to the Marshals for service along with USM-285 Forms, copies of the complaint, and copies of the Order issuing service. (bjc) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Caligaris for Defendants Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc., Hard Rock Cafe, Inc. Health Benefit Plan (Caligaris, Michael) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Ellis Willits for Defendants Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc., Hard Rock Cafe, Inc. Health Benefit Plan (Willits, Chad) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION Stipulated Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer, Move, or otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc., Hard Rock Cafe, Inc. Health Benefit Plan. (Willits, Chad) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines per doc #7 : Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc. answer due 7/26/2022; Hard Rock Cafe, Inc. Health Benefit Plan answer due 7/26/2022. (kh) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION Stipulated Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer, Move, or otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc., Hard Rock Cafe, Inc. Health Benefit Plan. (Willits, Chad) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Ellis Willits for Defendants Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc., Hard Rock Cafe, Inc. Health Benefit Plan (Willits, Chad) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Caligaris for Defendants Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc., Hard Rock Cafe, Inc. Health Benefit Plan (Caligaris, Michael) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc., Hard Rock Cafe, Inc. Health Benefit Plan and sent to the Marshals for service along with USM-285 Forms, copies of the complaint, and copies of the Order issuing service. (bjc) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Hard Rock Cafe International (USA), Inc., Hard Rock Cafe, Inc. Health Benefit Plan, filed by Kelly Fieger. (bjc). Modified To Replace Document on 5/27/2022 (bjc). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 05/27/2022. (bjc) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz added. Motions referred to Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kelly Fieger. (Attachments: #1 Supplement -Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-Proffered Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet -Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3-Summons for Plan, #5 Exhibit 4-Summons for Hard Rock, #6 Exhibit 5-Marshals Form for Hard Rock, #7 Exhibit 6-Marshals Form for Plan, #8 Exhibit 7-Proffered Order) (Fuchs, Jack) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARD ROCK CAFE INTERNATIONAL USA INC. A FLORIDA CORPORATION DBA HARD ROCK CAFE is a litigant