This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2022 at 08:41:30 (UTC).

Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland v. David M. Wolfford & Son, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against David M Wolfford Son, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Liam O'Grady and John F. Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01276

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland

Defendants

David M. Wolfford & Son, Inc.

David M. Wolfford

Barbara J. Wolfford

David M. Wolfford, Jr.

Beth R. Wolfford

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dustin Mitchell Paul

Attorney at Vandeventer Black LLP (Norfolk)

101 West Main Stsuite 500

Norfolk, VA 23510

Neil S. Lowenstein

Attorney at Vandeventer Black LLP

101 W. Main Street500 World Trade Center

Norfolk, VA 23510

Defendant Attorney

Ryan Fitzgerald Furgurson

Attorney at William B Cave & Associates PLLC

2800 Buford Rdsuite 102

Richmond, VA 23235

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that responsive pleadings for Defendants Barbara J. Wolfford, David M. Wolfford, Jr. and Beth R. Wolfford shall be due January 31, 2022. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/21/2021. (wgar, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

16 #2

Proposed Order

16 #1

Exhibit

#16

(#16) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Barbara J. Wolfford, Beth R. Wolfford, David M. Wolfford, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Furgurson, Ryan) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#14

(#14) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland as to David M. Wolfford & Son, Inc.. (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#13

(#13) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland as to David M. Wolfford. (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland David M. Wolfford, Jr served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021 (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland Beth R. Wolfford served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021 (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland Barbara J. Wolfford served on 11/30/2021, answer due 12/21/2021 (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

9 #1

Notice to Attorney

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to David M. Wolfford & Son, Inc., Barbara J. Wolfford, Beth R. Wolfford, David M. Wolfford, David M. Wolfford, Jr, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(nneb) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#8

(#8) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for service on David M. Wolfford & Son, Inc. by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#7

(#7) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8107275.), filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lowenstein, Neil) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that responsive pleadings for Defendants Barbara J. Wolfford, David M. Wolfford, Jr. and Beth R. Wolfford shall be due January 31, 2022. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/21/2021. (wgar, ) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Barbara J. Wolfford, Beth R. Wolfford, David M. Wolfford, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Furgurson, Ryan) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Fitzgerald Furgurson on behalf of Barbara J. Wolfford, Beth R. Wolfford, David M. Wolfford, Jr (Furgurson, Ryan) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland as to David M. Wolfford & Son, Inc.. (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland as to David M. Wolfford. (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland David M. Wolfford, Jr served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021 (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland Beth R. Wolfford served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021 (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland Barbara J. Wolfford served on 11/30/2021, answer due 12/21/2021 (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to David M. Wolfford & Son, Inc., Barbara J. Wolfford, Beth R. Wolfford, David M. Wolfford, David M. Wolfford, Jr, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(nneb) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for service on David M. Wolfford & Son, Inc. by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (nneb) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin Mitchell Paul on behalf of Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Paul, Dustin) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Lowenstein, Neil) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8107275.), filed by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lowenstein, Neil) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND is a litigant