Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2021 at 10:06:10 (UTC).

Fiddler v. turbocut Jopp GmbH et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Fiddler filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against turbocut Jopp GmbH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03057

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Fiddler

Defendants

Cotran Corporation

Turbocut Jopp GMBH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James H Cook

Attorney at Dutton Braun Staack Hellman

3151 Brockway Road, Po Box 810

Waterloo, IA 50704

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Order Appointing Special Process Service. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/2/2020. (mmc) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION Order Appointing Special Process Service by Plaintiff Mary Fiddler (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cook, James) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status by 12/30/2020. (skm) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

2 #1

New Civil Case Packet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Cotran Corporation, turbocut Jopp GmbH. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Cotran Corporation, turbocut Jopp GmbH (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3333541), filed by Mary Fiddler. Scheduling Report deadline 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cook, James) Modified text to correct type of deadline on 11/30/2020 (skm). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Order Appointing Special Process Service. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/2/2020. (mmc) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION Order Appointing Special Process Service by Plaintiff Mary Fiddler (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cook, James) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status by 12/30/2020. (skm) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Cotran Corporation, turbocut Jopp GmbH. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (skm) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketChief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts found). (skm) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Cotran Corporation, turbocut Jopp GmbH (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3333541), filed by Mary Fiddler. Scheduling Report deadline 2/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cook, James) Modified text to correct type of deadline on 11/30/2020 (skm). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James H. Cook