This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2020 at 08:38:03 (UTC).

Ferron v. Precision Directional Services, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Ferron filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Precision Directional Services, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03123

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTIAN FERRON

Defendants

Precision Drilling Corporation

PRECISION DIRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.,

Precision Directional Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert W Cowan

Attorney at Bailey Cowan Heckaman PLLC

5555 San Felipe, Suite 900

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorney

Michael Carter Crow

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney St, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010-3095

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Exhibit A - Notice of Consent

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent of Richard James Bean by Christian Ferron, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent)(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

13 #1

Exhibit A

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Filing Amended Notice of Consent of Brent McPherson by Brent McPherson, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Filing Amended Notice of Consent of Christian Ferron by Christian Ferron, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Precision Directional Services, Inc., Precision Drilling Corporation, filed.(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, and/or Strike Plaintiff's Class Definition and Related Class Allegations by Precision Directional Services, Inc., Precision Drilling Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION re: Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline for Plaintiff's Complaint by Precision Directional Services, Inc., Precision Drilling Corporation, filed.(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Christian Ferron, filed.(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Precision Drilling Corporation served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020, filed.(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Precision Directional Services, Inc. served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020, filed.(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit A - Notice of Consent

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Notice of Consent

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PRECISION DIRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.,, Precision Drilling Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25165591) filed by CHRISTIAN FERRON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent of Richard James Bean by Christian Ferron, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent)(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Filing Amended Notice of Consent of Brent McPherson by Brent McPherson, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Filing Amended Notice of Consent of Christian Ferron by Christian Ferron, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Precision Directional Services, Inc., Precision Drilling Corporation, filed.(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, and/or Strike Plaintiff's Class Definition and Related Class Allegations by Precision Directional Services, Inc., Precision Drilling Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION re: Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline for Plaintiff's Complaint by Precision Directional Services, Inc., Precision Drilling Corporation, filed.(Crow, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Christian Ferron, filed.(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Precision Drilling Corporation served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020, filed.(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Precision Directional Services, Inc. served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020, filed.(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent of Brent McPherson by Christian Ferron, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent)(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Precision Directional Services, Inc., Precision Drilling Corporation. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ChristopherSarrat, 4) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to PRECISION DIRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.,, Precision Drilling Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Additional Summons Request)(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PRECISION DIRECTIONAL SERVICES, INC.,, Precision Drilling Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25165591) filed by CHRISTIAN FERRON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cowan, Robert) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Precision Drilling Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Carter Crow