This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2021 at 09:31:21 (UTC).

FERRO v. ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 FERRO filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert N. Scola, Jr and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-20235

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRUNO FERRO

Defendant

ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Noah E Storch

Attorney at Celler Legal, P.A.

10368 West State Road 84, Suite 103

Davie, FL 33324

Alexander Thomas Harne

Attorney at Richard Celler Legal, P.A.

10368 West State Road 84, #103

Davie, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

Steven Adam Siegel

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips

450 E Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER STAYING CASE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 2/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE A STATEMENT OF CLAIM re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Order of Requirements,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, by BRUNO FERRO. Responses due by 2/24/2021 (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by BRUNO FERRO (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by BRUNO FERRO (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Thomas Harne on behalf of BRUNO FERRO. Attorney Alexander Thomas Harne added to party BRUNO FERRO(pty:pla). (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference, Order Requiring Statement of Claim and Response in FLSA case, and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 1/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC. (bb) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14248630, filed by BRUNO FERRO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Storch, Noah) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER STAYING CASE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 2/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Agreed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Case by ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC.. Attorney Steven Adam Siegel added to party ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 2/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #10 the Plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file his statement of claim. The Plaintiff must file his statement on or before February 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE A STATEMENT OF CLAIM re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Order of Requirements,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, by BRUNO FERRO. Responses due by 2/24/2021 (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by BRUNO FERRO (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by BRUNO FERRO (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Thomas Harne on behalf of BRUNO FERRO. Attorney Alexander Thomas Harne added to party BRUNO FERRO(pty:pla). (Harne, Alexander) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by BRUNO FERRO. ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC. served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. (Storch, Noah) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference, Order Requiring Statement of Claim and Response in FLSA case, and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 1/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC. (bb) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14248630, filed by BRUNO FERRO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Storch, Noah) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander Thomas Harne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noah E. Storch