This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2021 at 09:55:37 (UTC).

Ferrer v. Ethicon Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Ferrer filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William P. Dimitrouleas and Rodney Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-60050

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

William P. Dimitrouleas

Rodney Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brooke J. Ferrer

Defendants

Gynecare

Ethicon Women's Health & Urology

Ethicon Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas J. Brandi

Attorney at The Brandi Law Firm

354 Pine Street, Third Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Ami Rebecca Romanelli

Attorney at Osborne & Francis, PLLC

433 Plaza Real Blvd., Suite 271

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Stuart C. Talley

Attorney at Kershaw Cook & Talley PC

401 Watt Avenue

Sacramento, CA 95864

Casey Aron Kaufman

Attorney at The Brandi Law Firm

354 Pine Street, Third Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Andrew Allen Norden

Attorney at Osborne & Francis PLLC

433 Plaza Real Blvd., Suite 271, 33432

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street, 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mollie Fleming Benedict

Attorney at Tucker Ellis & West LLP

515 South Flower Street, 42Nd Floor, Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2223

Joshua J. Wes

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street, 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2233

Amanda Elizabeth Preston

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

200 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 4700

Miami, FL 33131

Andrew Russell Kruppa

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

200 S. Biscayne Blvd.,, Suite 4700

Miami, FL 33131-2398

 

Court Documents

#39

38 #2

Exhibit 2

38 #1

Exhibit 1

#38

#37

#36

35 #1

Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order

#35

34 #1

Exhibit A

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Standing Order

#2

#1

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Rodney Smith for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 3/5/2021. Judge William P. Dimitrouleas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION to Strike #37 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's "Notice" to Transfer by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Responses due by 3/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kruppa, Andrew) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Brooke J. Ferrer (Romanelli, Ami) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. Any motion to transfer this action to the docket of Judge Smith should be filed on or before February 26, 2021. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Kruppa, Andrew) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Kruppa, Andrew) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER granting #32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mollie Fleming Benedict representing Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); Attorney Nicholas Vaughan Janizeh representing Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); Attorney Joshua J. Wes representing Johnson & Johnson (Defendant) withdrawn from case. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Mollie Benedict, Nicholas Janizeh, Joshua Wes. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (lk) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Joshua J. Wes, Mollie Fleming Benedict and Nicholas Vaughan for / by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Responses due by 2/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Text of Proposed Order)(Preston, Amanda) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Elizabeth Preston on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Attorney Amanda Elizabeth Preston added to party Ethicon Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Elizabeth Preston added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft). (Preston, Amanda) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Russell Kruppa on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Attorney Andrew Russell Kruppa added to party Ethicon Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Russell Kruppa added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft). (Kruppa, Andrew) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER by MDL Panel on 10/29/2020. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2020) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TRNASMITTAL NOTICE re #8 Order Transferring Case (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012) (Entered: 09/05/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to MDL Panel, Southern District of West Virginia. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012) (Entered: 08/21/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brooke J. Ferrer. Johnson & Johnson served on 7/2/2012, answer due 7/23/2012. (Brandi, Thomas) (Filed on 8/21/2012) (Entered: 08/21/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brooke J. Ferrer. Gynecare served on 7/2/2012, answer due 7/23/2012. (Brandi, Thomas) (Filed on 8/21/2012) (Entered: 08/21/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brooke J. Ferrer. Ethicon Women's Health & Urology served on 7/2/2012, answer due 7/23/2012. (Brandi, Thomas) (Filed on 8/21/2012) (Entered: 08/21/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brooke J. Ferrer. Ethicon Inc. served on 7/2/2012, answer due 7/23/2012. (Brandi, Thomas) (Filed on 8/21/2012) (Entered: 08/21/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Ethicon Inc., Ethicon Women's Health & Urology, Gynecare, Johnson & Johnson. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012) (Entered: 06/27/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/25/12. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012) (Entered: 06/27/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT /no process against Ethicon Inc., Ethicon Women's Health & Urology, Gynecare, Johnson & Johnson ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611075568.). Filed byBrooke J. Ferrer. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2012) (Entered: 06/27/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Women's Health and Urology is a litigant

Latest cases where Gynecare is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant