This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2019 at 07:45:32 (UTC).

Ferrara v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability case was filed by Ferrara against C R Bard Incorporated in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Delaware District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01668

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Ferrara

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raeann Warner

Attorney at Jacobs & Crumplar, P.A.

750 Shipyard Drive, Suite 200, P. O. Box 1271

Wilmington, DE 19899

Defendant Attorney

Lisa Zwally Brown

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

The Nemours Building, 1007 North Orange Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeff T. Seldomridge - filed by Christopher Ferrara. (Warner, Raeann) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeff T. Seldomridge - filed by Christopher Ferrara. (Warner, Raeann) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#12

(#12) SO ORDERED Granting #11 Joint Stipulation and Order Requesting Stay of All Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/27/2019. (nms) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#11

(#11) Joint STIPULATION and Order Requesting Stay of All Proceedings by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Brown, Lisa) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Zwally Brown on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Brown, Lisa) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Raeann Warner on behalf of Christopher Ferrara (Warner, Raeann) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of of Filing Submission Regarding Remand or Transfer of Certain Cases. Designation of Record. (rwc) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

7 #1

Certified Bard MDL Docket Sheet

#7

(#7) CERTIFIED REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER - signed by the Honorable David G. Campbell on 8/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Certified Bard MDL Docket Sheet) (rwc) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#6

(#6) Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/9/2019. (lak) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Record of case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number in Other District: 2:18-cv-00475. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re #3 . Signed By Judge David G. Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 08/26/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeff T. Seldomridge, filed by Christopher Ferrara. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/3/2019. (nms) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeff T. Seldomridge - filed by Christopher Ferrara. (Warner, Raeann) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORAL ORDER: The Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeff T. Seldomridge (D.I. #13 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renew. Certifications by counsel need to be dated as to the day they were signed. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/2/2019. (nms) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeff T. Seldomridge - filed by Christopher Ferrara. (Warner, Raeann) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SO ORDERED Granting #11 Joint Stipulation and Order Requesting Stay of All Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/27/2019. (nms) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint STIPULATION and Order Requesting Stay of All Proceedings by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Brown, Lisa) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Zwally Brown on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Brown, Lisa) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Raeann Warner on behalf of Christopher Ferrara (Warner, Raeann) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of of Filing Submission Regarding Remand or Transfer of Certain Cases. Designation of Record. (rwc) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFIED REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER - signed by the Honorable David G. Campbell on 8/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Certified Bard MDL Docket Sheet) (rwc) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 10/9/2019. (lak) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Record of case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number in Other District: 2:18-cv-00475. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Remark: Case transferred to District of Delaware via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re #3 . Signed By Judge David G. Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • (#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-475-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15154925 filed by Christopher Ferrara. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/9/2019.] (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.