This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/17/2020 at 13:18:27 (UTC).

Ferrando v. Utah Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 Ferrando filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Utah Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bruce S. Jenkins and Robert J. Shelby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00386

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Bruce S. Jenkins

Robert J. Shelby

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Todd J. Ferrando

Vernal, UT 84078

Defendants

Mike Hadden

Utah Department of Corrections

Robert Powell

Carl Muniz

Not Classified By Court

Prisoner Litigation Unit

Correction Section (FYI)

Salt Lake City, UT 84114-0856

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to pay the initial court filing fee (30 days) filed by Plaintiff Todd J. Ferrando. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Bruce S. Jenkins recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 08/06/2020. (kpf) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

5 #2

Envelope 1

5 #1

Civil Cover Sheet 1

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT against Mike Hadden, Carl Muniz, Robert Powell, Utah Department of Corrections (Originally received by the court on 06/18/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Todd J. Ferrando. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (jl) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $7.39. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 07/07/2020. (jl) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Mail sent to Todd J. Ferrando. Return to sender no longer located at the Uintah County Jail. Prisoner Offender Locator locates him at the Duchesne Co Jail. The attached document will be re mailed. (kpf) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to pay the initial court filing fee (30 days) filed by Plaintiff Todd J. Ferrando. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kpf) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Bruce S. Jenkins recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 08/06/2020. (kpf) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Mike Hadden, Carl Muniz, Robert Powell, Utah Department of Corrections (Originally received by the court on 06/18/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Todd J. Ferrando. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1, #2 Envelope 1) Assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins (jl) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: $7.39. If initial partial fee is not paid within 30 days, the case will be dismissed. Collection of Fees Sent: Yes Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 07/07/2020. (jl) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Mail sent to Todd J. Ferrando. Return to sender no longer located at the Uintah County Jail. Prisoner Offender Locator locates him at the Duchesne Co Jail. The attached document will be re mailed. (kpf) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) *** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement for Todd J. Ferrando received from Correctional Institution (jl) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 06/18/2020) filed by Plaintiff Todd J. Ferrando. (jl) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Utah Department of Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases where Prisoner Litigation Unit is a litigant