This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/22/2022 at 23:52:15 (UTC).

Fernandez v. Walmart, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 Fernandez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Walmart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are M. James Lorenz and William V. Gallo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00677

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M. James Lorenz

Referral Judge

William V. Gallo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria D. Fernandez

Defendants

Walmart, Inc.

Does 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Andrew Kaufman

Attorney at Law Office of David A. Kaufman

3162 Via Alicante, Unit E

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant Attorneys

Christine Yoon Dixon

Attorney at Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz & Dolin

11622 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

Jennifer N. Lutz

Attorney at Pettit Kohn Ingrassia & Lutz PC

11622 El Camino Real, Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice Notice of Lodgment of State Court File

1 #3

Exhibit State Court File - Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit State Court File - Summons

1 #5

Exhibit State Court File - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit State Court File - Notice of Case Assignment

1 #7

Exhibit State Court File - Answer

1 #8

Declaration of Christine Y. Dixon

1 #9

Proof of Service Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Walmart, Inc. (cxt)(jrd) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties by Walmart, Inc. (Dixon, Christine) (fth). (Entered: 05/13/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER for (1) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/10/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Attorneys-Only Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/28/2022 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/2/2022. (fth) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE AND ORDER for (1) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/10/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Attorneys-Only Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/28/2022 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/2/2022. (fth) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties by Walmart, Inc. (Dixon, Christine) (fth). (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Walmart, Inc. (cxt)(jrd) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16821772.), filed by Walmart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice Notice of Lodgment of State Court File, #3 Exhibit State Court File - Complaint, #4 Exhibit State Court File - Summons, #5 Exhibit State Court File - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit State Court File - Notice of Case Assignment, #7 Exhibit State Court File - Answer, #8 Declaration of Christine Y. Dixon, #9 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)The new case number is 3:22-cv-677-L-WVG. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(cxt)(jrd) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer N Lutz