This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/10/2022 at 10:32:52 (UTC).

Antonio Fernandez v. Rose Stone LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 Antonio Fernandez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Rose Stone LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02446

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Fernandez

Defendants

Rose Stone LLC

Fahd Ashkar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark D Potter

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Ariel Elizabeth Vento

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Claire Cylkowski

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Potter Handy, LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Proof of Service

16 #16

Main Document

#14

(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock counsel for Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. Ariel Vento is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

13 #2

Proof of Service

13 #1

Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Fahd Ashkar served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Osvaldo Doe Cashier in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Rose Stone LLC served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Fahd Ashkar, Rose Stone LLC. (car) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#9

(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Claire Cylkowski on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Claire Cylkowski added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Cylkowski, Claire) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ariel Elizabeth Vento on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Ariel Elizabeth Vento added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Vento, Ariel) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. On May 18, 2022, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Settlement (ECF No. 13) notifying the Court that the parties have reached a resolution in this matter. The Court, having considered the Notice of Settlement and finding good cause therefor, ORDERS as follows: (1) All discovery and pretrial dates are vacated; and (2) The parties shall file a notice of dismissal or, in the alternative, a joint statement advising the Court of the status of the settlement within sixty (60) days of this Order. The failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order may, without further warning, result in the Court dismissing this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock counsel for Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. Ariel Vento is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Settlement and Request to vacate all currently set dates filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Fahd Ashkar served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Osvaldo Doe Cashier in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Rose Stone LLC served on 5/12/2022, answer due 6/2/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Fahd Ashkar, Rose Stone LLC. (car) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Claire Cylkowski on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Claire Cylkowski added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Cylkowski, Claire) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ariel Elizabeth Vento on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Ariel Elizabeth Vento added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Vento, Ariel) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33111862 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark D. Potter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond George Ballister, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Lockhart Seabock