This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 07:47:58 (UTC).

Fernandez v. Millcom Cable Service LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Fernandez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Millcom Cable Service LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray H Miller. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04942

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray H Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAMUEL FERNANDEZ

Kyle Simmons

Joe Partin, Jr

Christopher A. Gonzales

Defendants

MILLCOM CABLE SERVICE LLC

ANTHONY MILLER

PerfectVision Manufacturing, Inc. doing business as Perfect 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregg M Rosenberg

Renee Nguyen

Defendant Attorneys

Peter Justin Stuhldreher

Paul M. Knettel

Mark D Temple

 

Court Documents

#51

#50

#49

48 #1

Proposed Order

#48

47 #1

Proposed Order

#47

46 #2

Exhibit B

#46

5 #1

Consent of Christopher A. Gonzales

#5

#4

3 #2

Consent of Joe Partin Jr.

3 #1

Consent of Kyle Simmons

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit Ex 1

#1

95 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#51) ORDER OF DISMISSAL GRANTING #49 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice. Case terminated on 1/27/2021 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#50) Joint PROPOSED ORDER Order of Dimissal with Prejudice re: #49 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Wtih Prejudice, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#49) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Wtih Prejudice by Samuel Fernandez, Christopher A. Gonzales, Joe Partin, Jr, Kyle Simmons, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2021. (Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#48) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Case Deadlines by Millcom Cable Service LLC, Anthony Miller, PerfectVision Manufacturing, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Temple, Mark) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#47) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Case Deadlines by Millcom Cable Service LLC, Anthony Miller, PerfectVision Manufacturing, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Temple, Mark) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#46) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Millcom Cable Service LLC, Anthony Miller, PerfectVision Manufacturing, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Temple, Mark) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#45) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CO-COUNSEL by Samuel Fernandez, Christopher A. Gonzales, Joe Partin, Jr, Kyle Simmons, filed. (Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#44) NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Nguyen on behalf of Samuel Fernandez, Christopher A. Gonzales, Joe Partin, Jr, Kyle Simmons, filed. (Nguyen, Renee) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#43) DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Samuel Fernandez, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#42) SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 3 days. Jury trial. Amended Pleadings due by 9/18/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/21/2020 Pltf Expert Report due by 10/16/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 11/20/2020. Discovery due by 12/18/2020. Mediation due by 4/30/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 1/22/2021. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 1/22/2021. Objections due by 5/21/2021 Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/14/2021. Docket Call set for 5/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9D before Judge Gray H Miller(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
02/28/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Samuel Fernandez, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File a Responsive Pleading by PerfectVision Manufacturing, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Temple, Mark) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Anthony Miller served on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Coty Seivert by Samuel Fernandez, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Coty Seivert)(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to PerfectVision Manufacturing, Inc. served on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/21/2020, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Christopher A. Gonzales by Samuel Fernandez, filed. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Christopher A. Gonzales)(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Samuel Fernandez, filed.(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/07/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Kyle Simmons and Joe Partin Jr. by Samuel Fernandez, filed. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Kyle Simmons, #2 Consent of Joe Partin Jr.)(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 2/28/2020 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23806892) filed by SAMUEL FERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1)(Rosenberg, Gregg) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less