This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/26/2021 at 09:10:18 (UTC).

Antonio Fernandez v. Golden Valley Place, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 Antonio Fernandez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Golden Valley Place, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald S.W. Lew and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00650

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald S.W. Lew

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Fernandez

Defendants

Hong Kong Supermarket of Monterey Park, Ltd.

Golden Valley Place, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorneys

Wendy Wai-Li Doo

Attorney at Law Offices of Doo and Chong

2596 Mission Street Suite 302

San Marino, CA 91108

Robert W Chong

Attorney at Law Offices of Doo and Chong

2596 Mission Street Suite 302

San Marino, CA 91108

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#12

#13

#14

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hong Kong Supermarket of Monterey Park, Ltd., (Chong, Robert) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hong Kong Supermarket of Monterey Park, Ltd. answer now due 3/24/2021, filed by Defendant Hong Kong Supermarket of Monterey Park, Ltd..(Attorney Robert W Chong added to party Hong Kong Supermarket of Monterey Park, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Chong, Robert) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Hong Kong Supermarket of Monterey Park, Ltd. served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent For Service Of Process: Jianqing Gu (manager Nancy Hu) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandezto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,, #9 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (shb) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE EXERCISE OF SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION RE STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim asserted in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than February 4, 2021. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (shb) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-00650 RSWL(PLAx). (rn) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Golden Valley Place, LLC, Hong Kong Supermarket of Monterey Park, Ltd. (lh) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30211042 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hong Kong Supermarket of Monterey Park, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis Jay Price, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell Clive Handy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Lockhart Seabock