This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2020 at 13:12:44 (UTC).

Fernandez v. FedEx Corporate Services, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 Fernandez filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against FedEx Corporate Services, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are HELEN GILLMOR and ROM TRADER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00031

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HELEN GILLMOR

Referral Judge

ROM TRADER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonja Fernandez

Defendants

Jeff Martin

FedEx Corporate Services, Inc.

Doe Defendants 1-25

Theresa Rubinoff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rodney P. Bridgers, Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of Rodney Bridgers, LLLC

707 Richards Street, Suite 526

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorney

Sarah O. Wang

Attorney at Marr Jones & Wang

1003 Bishop Street Ste 1500, 536-4900, Fax: 536-6700

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

25 #5

Certificate of Service

25 #4

Exhibit

25 #3

Exhibit

25 #2

Declaration

#25

(#25) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Sonja Fernandez's Response in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Dismiss. Rodney Parry Bridgers, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Sonja Fernandez (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Rodney Bridgers, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Certificate of Service)(Bridgers, Rodney) Docket Entry/Text Modified on 3/16/2020 (jo) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

12 #5

Exhibit D

12 #4

Exhibit C

12 #3

Exhibit B

#12

(#18) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion:On February 14, 2020, Defendant Jeff Martin filed:DEFENDANT JEFF MARTIN'S MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF No. #12 )Plaintiff Sonja Fernandez shall file her Opposition on or before Monday, March 9, 2020.Defendant Jeff Martin shall file his Reply on or before Monday, March 23, 2020.A hearing on Defendant Jeff Martin's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #12 ) shall be held on Monday, April 13, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor.(rls, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

5 #1

Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Re: JIMS

#5

(#5) TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii; CV 1CCV190002274 (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Re: JIMS, #2 Case Detail Docket List) (jo) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

4 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements

#4

(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/24/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FedEx Corporate Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for FedEx Corporate Services, Inc... (Wang, Sarah) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#9) RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant Jeff Martin's Consent to Removal by Defendant FedEx Corporate Services, Inc. filed by FedEx Corporate Services, Inc.. (Wang, Sarah) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Sonja Fernandez's Response in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Dismiss. Rodney Parry Bridgers, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Sonja Fernandez (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Rodney Bridgers, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Certificate of Service)(Bridgers, Rodney) Docket Entry/Text Modified on 3/16/2020 (jo) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 3/4/2020. (jo) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) AMENDED EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had.Court confirms Defendant Jeff Martins Motion to Dismiss [ECF 12] is pending hearing before District Judge Gillmor on 04/13/2020. Telephone Status Conference set for 05/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader.Court to issue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference order.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 9:00 a.m. on 05/18/2021 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 05/06/2021 at 10:30 a.m. in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 04/06/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 2/16/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER.Settlement Conference statements due by 02/09/2021. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/16/2020. Discovery due by 03/19/2021. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had.Court confirms Defendant Jeff Martins Motion to Dismiss [ECF 12] is pending hearing before District Judge Gillmor on 04/13/2020. Telephone Status Conference set for 05/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader.Court to issue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference order.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 9:00 a.m. on 05/18/2021 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 05/06/2021 at 9:30 a.m. in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 04/06/2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER.Settlement Conference is set for 02/16/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference statements due by 02/09/2021. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/16/2020. Discovery due by 3/19/2021. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Sonja Fernandez. (Bridgers, Rodney) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Sonja Fernandez. (Bridgers, Rodney) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) INITIAL DISCLOSURE by FedEx Corporate Services, Inc.. (Babcock, Barak) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion:On February 14, 2020, Defendant Jeff Martin filed:DEFENDANT JEFF MARTIN'S MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF No. #12 )Plaintiff Sonja Fernandez shall file her Opposition on or before Monday, March 9, 2020.Defendant Jeff Martin shall file his Reply on or before Monday, March 23, 2020.A hearing on Defendant Jeff Martin's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #12 ) shall be held on Monday, April 13, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor.(rls, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#17) EO: On 2/14/20, Plaintiff Sonja Fernandez filed a Motion to Continue February 24, 2020 Scheduling Conference ("Motion") (ECF No. 13). Plaintiff explains that her counsel is scheduled for surgery on 2/20/20. Plaintiff seeks a continuance of the Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 02/24/20. Plaintiff's counsel anticipates he will recover from surgery and will be able to resume normal duties the week of 03/02/20. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is continued from 02/24/20 at 9:00 a.m. to 03/03/2020 at 9:00 a.m. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Plaintiff Sonja Fernandez's RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Sonja Fernandez. (Bridgers, Rodney) Docket Text Modified on 2/19/2020 (jo) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BARAK J. BABCOCK re: #6 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/31/2020. Barak J. Babcock, Esq. (Firm: Federal Express Corporation Legal Department) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Defendants FedEx Corporate Services Inc. and Jeffrey B. Martin (jo) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant Jeff Martin's Consent to Removal by Defendant FedEx Corporate Services, Inc. filed by FedEx Corporate Services, Inc.. (Wang, Sarah) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant FedEx Corporate Services, Inc. by FedEx Corporate Services, Inc.. (Wang, Sarah) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Joseph B. Reafsnyder) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2325000.Sarah O. Wang appearing for Defendants FedEx Corporate Services, Inc., Jeff Martin (Wang, Sarah) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Barak J. Babcock) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2324976.Sarah O. Wang appearing for Defendants FedEx Corporate Services, Inc., Jeff Martin (Wang, Sarah) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii; CV 1CCV190002274 (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Re: JIMS, #2 Case Detail Docket List) (jo) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/24/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00031 HG-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FedEx Corporate Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for FedEx Corporate Services, Inc... (Wang, Sarah) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FedEx Corporate Services, Inc., et al. Defendant FedEx Corporate Services, Inc.'s Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court from First Circuit, case number 19-0002274. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2322719), filed by FedEx Corporate Services, Inc., et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Wang, Sarah) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDEX CORPORATE SERVICES INC. AKA FED EX is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah O. Wang Esquire