This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2019 at 07:44:36 (UTC).

FERNANDEZ et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 FERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Bloom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-24073

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REINA ISABEL FERNANDEZ

SERGIO FLORES

Defendant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Miami, FL 33132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Jackson Feight, II

Attorney at Luks, Santaniello, Petrillo & Jones

150 W. Flagler Street, Suite 2750

Miami, FL 33131

Marc Phillip Ganz

Attorney at Nosich & Ganz

75 Valencia Avenue, Suite 1100

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by REINA ISABEL FERNANDEZ. REINA ISABEL FERNANDEZ served on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Ganz, Marc) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE re #3 Summons Issued as to USA Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (ar2) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Reina Isabel Fernandez against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12032413, filed by REINA ISABEL FERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Ganz, Marc) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect party served was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see DE# 7 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by REINA ISABEL FERNANDEZ, SERGIO FLORES. US Attorney served on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (See DE#6 for image). (jas) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by REINA ISABEL FERNANDEZ. REINA ISABEL FERNANDEZ served on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Ganz, Marc) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE re #3 Summons Issued as to USA Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (ar2) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Reina Isabel Fernandez against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12032413, filed by REINA ISABEL FERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Ganz, Marc) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less