This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/28/2022 at 07:41:59 (UTC).

FERNANDEZ et al v. LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 FERNANDEZ filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia G. Cooke and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-62590

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia G. Cooke

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSE FERNANDEZ

LUISA FERNANDA RAMIREZ

Defendant

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erin Renee Dix

Attorney at Cohen Law Group

350 N Lake Destiny Road

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendant Attorneys

Crystalin C Medeiros

Attorney at The Teebagy & Medeiros Law Group

2001 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd.Suite 502C

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

Steven Charles Teebagy

Attorney at The Teebagy & Medeiros Law Group

2001 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd.Suite 502C

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#4

(#4) DEFENDANTS ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Teebagy, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#5

(#5) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Cohen Law Group, Corporate Parent The Teebagy & Medeiros Law Group, PLLC, Corporate Parent LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent LUISA FERNANDA RAMIREZ, Corporate Parent JOSE FERNANDEZ for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (Teebagy, Steven) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (Teebagy, Steven) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erin Renee Dix on behalf of LUISA FERNANDA RAMIREZ, JOSE FERNANDEZ (Dix, Erin) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#9

(#9) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by LUISA FERNANDA RAMIREZ, JOSE FERNANDEZ (Dix, Erin) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Joint Proposed Scheduling Order

#12

(#12) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by LUISA FERNANDA RAMIREZ, JOSE FERNANDEZ identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent Landmark Insurance Company, Corporate Parent American International Group, Other Affiliate Cohen Law Group, Other Affiliate The Teebagy & Medeiros Law Group, PLLC, Other Affiliate Erin Dix, Other Affiliate Steven Teebagy, Other Affiliate Crytalin Medeiros for JOSE FERNANDEZ, LUISA FERNANDA RAMIREZ (Dix, Erin) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER Setting Civil Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 4/10/2023 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Calendar Call set for 4/5/2023 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2022. Expert Discovery due by 10/21/2022. Fact Discovery due by 9/9/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2022. Mediation Deadline 12/23/2022. In Limine Motions due by 3/3/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2022. Motions due by 11/4/2022. Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/3/2023. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 12/23/2022. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 12/23/2022. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Setting Civil Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines: Jury Trial set for 4/10/2023 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Calendar Call set for 4/5/2023 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2022. Expert Discovery due by 10/21/2022. Fact Discovery due by 9/9/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2022. Mediation Deadline 12/23/2022. In Limine Motions due by 3/3/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 11/4/2022. Motions due by 11/4/2022. Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/3/2023. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by LUISA FERNANDA RAMIREZ, JOSE FERNANDEZ identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent Landmark Insurance Company, Corporate Parent American International Group, Other Affiliate Cohen Law Group, Other Affiliate The Teebagy & Medeiros Law Group, PLLC, Other Affiliate Erin Dix, Other Affiliate Steven Teebagy, Other Affiliate Crytalin Medeiros for JOSE FERNANDEZ, LUISA FERNANDA RAMIREZ (Dix, Erin) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Clerks Notice to Filer re #9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (mc) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by LUISA FERNANDA RAMIREZ, JOSE FERNANDEZ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Dix, Erin) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by LUISA FERNANDA RAMIREZ, JOSE FERNANDEZ (Dix, Erin) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erin Renee Dix on behalf of LUISA FERNANDA RAMIREZ, JOSE FERNANDEZ (Dix, Erin) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement,. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (jbs) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (Teebagy, Steven) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Cohen Law Group, Corporate Parent The Teebagy & Medeiros Law Group, PLLC, Corporate Parent LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent LUISA FERNANDA RAMIREZ, Corporate Parent JOSE FERNANDEZ for LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY (Teebagy, Steven) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEFENDANTS ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Teebagy, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15282768, filed by LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Teebagy, Steven) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Charles Teebagy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Crystalin C Medeiros