This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2021 at 08:28:18 (UTC).

Fernandez-Espinoza v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Fernandez-Espinoza filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against U S Immigration and Customs Enforcement. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William P. Dimitrouleas and Lurana S. Snow. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-61229

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

Referral Judge

Lurana S. Snow

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michelle Fernandez-Espinoza

Defendant

Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, Immigration Customs Enforcement

Respondent

U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Anthony Richard Dominguez

Attorney at Prada Urizar, PLLC

3191 Coral Way, Suite 500

Miami, FL 33145

Respondent Attorneys

Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney

Noticing INS Attorney

Kelsi R. Romero

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER APPROVING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Closing Case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by Michelle Fernandez-Espinoza. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED and ADJUDGED that oral argument is set for 1:15 p.m. on Thursday, July 15, 2021, in Courtroom 205B at the U.S. Courthouse, 299 E. Broward Boulevard, Fort Lauderdale, Florida. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting in Part #5 Motion for Order to Show Cause. In accordance with the Courts prior Order, Petitioner shall serve the petition and this Order on Respondent on or before June 21, 2021. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement response due 7/2/2021. Petitioner has until July 13, 2021 to file a Reply Brief. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER APPROVING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Closing Case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PAPERLESS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: re 13 PAPERLESS Order Setting Hearing on Motion re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by Michelle Fernandez-Espinoza. **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2021 02:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/13/2021.per DE #12 (cbr) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PAPERLESS Order Setting Hearing on Motion re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by Michelle Fernandez-Espinoza. **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2021 02:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/13/2021. (cbr) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Stipulated Notice) by Michelle Fernandez-Espinoza (Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines/Hearing PER DE#11 . Motion Hearing/Oral Argument set for 7/15/2021 01:15 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. (cds) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by Michelle Fernandez-Espinoza. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED and ADJUDGED that oral argument is set for 1:15 p.m. on Thursday, July 15, 2021, in Courtroom 205B at the U.S. Courthouse, 299 E. Broward Boulevard, Fort Lauderdale, Florida. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY by Michelle Fernandez-Espinoza. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Supp. Appx.)(Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I-213, #2 Exhibit B-Sworn Statement, #3 Exhibit C-EARM, #4 Exhibit D-NTA, #5 Exhibit E-IJ Decision)(Romero, Kelsi) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Michelle Fernandez-Espinoza. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 6/19/2021, answer due 8/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return Receipt AUSA, #2 Exhibit B - USPS Certified Tracking)(Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 06/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Granting in Part #5 Motion for Order to Show Cause. In accordance with the Courts prior Order, Petitioner shall serve the petition and this Order on Respondent on or before June 21, 2021. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelsi R. Romero on behalf of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Attorney Kelsi R. Romero added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:res). (Romero, Kelsi) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Order to Show Cause and to advance Response and Traverse deadlines; by Michelle Fernandez-Espinoza. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Redacted Copy of bond hearing in unrelated case on June 14, 2021 (evidence of counsel's commitment on June 14, 2021), #3 Exhibit B - Petitioner's medical records from the Fort Lauderdale Behavioral Health Center, #4 Exhibit C - Translated Letter from petitioner's mother, Rosa Maria Espinoza Benza, regardings petitioner's treatment at BTC)(Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement response due 7/2/2021. Petitioner has until July 13, 2021 to file a Reply Brief. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cds) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. (cds) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14762030, filed by Michelle Fernandez-Espinoza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, #3 Appendix Appx. I - Petitioner's supporting documents, #4 Appendix Appx. II - DED for Venezuela, #5 Appendix Appx. III - TPS for Venezuela, #6 Appendix Appx. IV - Petitioner's TPS Receipt and Application)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Dominguez, Anthony) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Field Office Directo Kimberly D Dean is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant