This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2022 at 08:15:46 (UTC).

FERGUSSON v. REMEDY INTELLIGENT STAFFING, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 FERGUSSON filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against REMEDY INTELLIGENT STAFFING, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAN R. SANCHEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01910

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREW FERGUSSON

Defendants

REMEDY INTELLIGENT STAFFING, LLC

SONOCO PRODUCTS CORPORATION doing business as SONOCO THERMOSAFE

SHIVAM VARDHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARI RISSON KARPF

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road

TIMOTHY S. SEILER

Attorney at KARPF KARPF & CERUTTI

3331 Street Road Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

Robert B. Koehler

Attorney at Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.

3331 Street Road

Defendant Attorneys

MATTHEW J. HANK

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C.

Three Parkway

ANDREW LAFIURA

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

Three Parkway, 1601 Cherry St Ste 1350

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Sarah B. Simanglatt

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

1601 Cherry Street, Suite 1350

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against REMEDY INTELLIGENT STAFFING, LLC, SONOCO PRODUCTS CORPORATION, SHIVAM VARDHAN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15923811.), filed by ANDREW FERGUSSON.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to REMEDY INTELLIGENT STAFFING, LLC, SONOCO PRODUCTS CORPORATION, SHIVAM VARDHAN. (rf, ) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANDREW FERGUSSON. SONOCO PRODUCTS CORPORATION waiver sent on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW LAFIURA on behalf of SONOCO PRODUCTS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(LAFIURA, ANDREW) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah B. Simanglatt on behalf of SONOCO PRODUCTS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(Simanglatt, Sarah) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY S. SEILER on behalf of ANDREW FERGUSSON (SEILER, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Koehler on behalf of ANDREW FERGUSSON (Koehler, Robert) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW J. HANK on behalf of REMEDY INTELLIGENT STAFFING, LLC with Certificate of Service(HANK, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW J. HANK on behalf of REMEDY INTELLIGENT STAFFING, LLC with Certificate of Service(HANK, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Koehler on behalf of ANDREW FERGUSSON (Koehler, Robert) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY S. SEILER on behalf of ANDREW FERGUSSON (SEILER, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah B. Simanglatt on behalf of SONOCO PRODUCTS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(Simanglatt, Sarah) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW LAFIURA on behalf of SONOCO PRODUCTS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(LAFIURA, ANDREW) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANDREW FERGUSSON. SONOCO PRODUCTS CORPORATION waiver sent on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to REMEDY INTELLIGENT STAFFING, LLC, SONOCO PRODUCTS CORPORATION, SHIVAM VARDHAN. (rf, ) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against REMEDY INTELLIGENT STAFFING, LLC, SONOCO PRODUCTS CORPORATION, SHIVAM VARDHAN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15923811.), filed by ANDREW FERGUSSON.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SONOCO PRODUCTS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where REMEDY INTELLIGENT STAFFING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW LAFIURA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEW J. HANK