This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:21:19 (UTC).

Ferguson v. VW Credit Inc / VW Credit

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Ferguson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against VW Credit Inc / VW Credit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leigh Martin May and Alan J. Baverman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05651

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

Referral Judge

Alan J. Baverman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard L Ferguson

Buford, GA 30519

Defendant

VW Credit Inc / VW Credit

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Complaint, filed by Richard L Ferguson. The undersigned RECOMMENDS to the District Judge that she DISMISS Plaintiff's complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to Plaintiff's failure to comply with a lawful court order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/10/2020. (tmf) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/10/2020. (tmf) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's application to proceed IFP, and ORDERS Plaintiff to file an amended complaint consistent with the Court's instructions within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/28/2019. (tmf) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT filed by Richard L Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard L Ferguson re #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Complaint, filed by Richard L Ferguson. (tmf) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/10/2020. (tmf) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Complaint, filed by Richard L Ferguson. The undersigned RECOMMENDS to the District Judge that she DISMISS Plaintiff's complaint WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to Plaintiff's failure to comply with a lawful court order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 2/10/2020. (tmf) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (tmf) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Re-Mailing as to Richard L Ferguson re #3 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff called 1/8/2020 and said he had not received mailing. (tmf) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Richard L Ferguson re #3 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,. (tmf) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's application to proceed IFP, and ORDERS Plaintiff to file an amended complaint consistent with the Court's instructions within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 12/28/2019. (tmf) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT filed by Richard L Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (ah) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard L Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.