This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2019 at 05:11:09 (UTC).

Fergus v. Lifestream Behavioral Center Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 Fergus filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Lifestream Behavioral Center Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip R. Lammens and James S. Moody, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00145

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marian Fergus

Defendant

Lifestream Behavioral Center Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathaly Saavedra

Attorney at Remer & Georges-Pierre, PLLC

44 W Flager St Ste 2200

Miami, FL 33130-6807

Peter Michael Hoogerwoerd

Attorney at Remer & Georges-Pierre, PLLC

44 W Flager St Ste 2200

Miami, FL 33130-6807

Defendant Attorney

Maria A. Santoro

Attorney at Dennis, Jackson, Martin & Fontela, PA

Suite 200, 1591 Summit Lake Dr

Tallahassee, FL 32317

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Santoro, Maria) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Michael Hoogerwoerd on behalf of Marian Fergus (Hoogerwoerd, Peter) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Lifestream Behavioral Center Inc. from 08/21/2019 to 09/11/2019. (Santoro, Maria) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Lifestream Behavioral Center Inc..(Santoro, Maria) Modified on 6/11/2019 (HAI). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Maria A. Santoro on behalf of Lifestream Behavioral Center Inc. (Santoro, Maria) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS issued as to Lifestream Behavioral Center Inc.. (LAB) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Marian Fergus. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Marian Fergus. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#3

(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 3/21/2019. (SMB) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Lifestream Behavioral Center Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15263412) filed by Marian Fergus. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Santoro, Maria) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Michael Hoogerwoerd on behalf of Marian Fergus (Hoogerwoerd, Peter) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of unavailability of counsel by Lifestream Behavioral Center Inc. from 08/21/2019 to 09/11/2019. (Santoro, Maria) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Lifestream Behavioral Center Inc..(Santoro, Maria) Modified on 6/11/2019 (HAI). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Maria A. Santoro on behalf of Lifestream Behavioral Center Inc. (Santoro, Maria) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS issued as to Lifestream Behavioral Center Inc.. (LAB) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Marian Fergus. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Marian Fergus. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 3/21/2019. (SMB) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:19-cv-145-Oca-30PRL. (SJB) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Lifestream Behavioral Center Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15263412) filed by Marian Fergus. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIFESTREAM BEHAVIORAL CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Michael Hoogerwoerd

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathaly Saavedra