8:23-CV-00309
02/22/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Finance - Consumer Credit
David O. Carter
John D. Early
Fereydoun Shoraka
Bank of America, N.A.
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Equifax Information Solutions, LLC
Trans Union LLC
Hunt and Henriques, LLP
Michael Frederick Cardoza
Lauren B Veggian
Adam F Summerfield
Michael Akira Kushner
Cheryl L. O'Connor
John A Vogt
Theodore Roethke
Thomas P Quinn, Jr
Donald E. Bradley
Ritka Singh
Tomio B Narita
Nathan Andrew Searles
Declaration
(#32) STATUS REPORT Joint re: Deposition Scheduling filed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Veggian, Lauren) (Entered: 04/20/2023)
(#31) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Theodore Roethke on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Solutions, LLC (Attorney Theodore Roethke added to party Equifax Information Solutions, LLC(pty:dft))(Roethke, Theodore) (Entered: 04/19/2023)
Proposed Order
Declaration
Memorandum
(#30) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/29/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney John A Vogt added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Vogt, John) (Entered: 04/19/2023)
(#29) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Michael Kushner at mkushner@jonesday.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2023)
(#28) MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference (not held) before Judge David O. Carter. The case is called. The Court and counsel confer. The Court ORDERS depositions be completed before status conference set for May 15, 2023 at 8:30 AM. The Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to May 15, 2023 at 8:30 AM. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (twdb) (Entered: 04/10/2023)
(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on February 22, 2023. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on February 22, 2023. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on February 22, 2023. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
Exhibit E
Exhibit D
Exhibit C
Exhibit B
Exhibit A
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka, upon Defendant Hunt and Henriques, LLP served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Scott Hunt, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/1/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
Docket(#32) STATUS REPORT Joint re: Deposition Scheduling filed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Veggian, Lauren) (Entered: 04/20/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Theodore Roethke on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Solutions, LLC (Attorney Theodore Roethke added to party Equifax Information Solutions, LLC(pty:dft))(Roethke, Theodore) (Entered: 04/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#30) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/29/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney John A Vogt added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Vogt, John) (Entered: 04/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#29) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Michael Kushner at mkushner@jonesday.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#28) MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference (not held) before Judge David O. Carter. The case is called. The Court and counsel confer. The Court ORDERS depositions be completed before status conference set for May 15, 2023 at 8:30 AM. The Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to May 15, 2023 at 8:30 AM. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (twdb) (Entered: 04/10/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#27) TEXT ONLY ORDER By District Judge David O. Carter DENYING REQUEST for Leave to Appear for Remotely at Scheduling Conference #26 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/07/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#26) REQUEST for Leave to Appear for Remotely at Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Singh, Ritka) (Entered: 04/07/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#25) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 04/03/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#24) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A..(Summerfield, Adam) (Entered: 03/31/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#23) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Equifax Information Solutions, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 03/31/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka, upon Defendant Hunt and Henriques, LLP served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Scott Hunt, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/1/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Trans Union LLC, upon Defendant Trans Union LLC served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/25/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka, upon Defendant Equifax Information Solutions, LLC served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/25/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons Executed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Emanuel Jacobo, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/25/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka, upon Defendant Bank of America, N.A. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Emanuel Jacobo, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/25/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
[-] Read LessDocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Solutions, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Hunt and Henriques, LLP, Trans Union LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/5/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on February 22, 2023. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc; Central Source LLC; Online Data Exchange LLC; New Management Services LLC; VantageScore Solutions LLC; Opt-Out Services LLC. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2022-01295549-CU-CR-NJC Receipt No: ACACDC-34833907 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Michael Akira Kushner added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)
[-] Read Less