This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2023 at 07:49:16 (UTC).

Fereydoun Shoraka v. Bank of America, N.A. et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 Fereydoun Shoraka filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Bank of America, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:23-CV-00309

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fereydoun Shoraka

Defendants

Bank of America, N.A.

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Equifax Information Solutions, LLC

Trans Union LLC

Hunt and Henriques, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Frederick Cardoza

Lauren B Veggian

Defendant Attorneys

Adam F Summerfield

Michael Akira Kushner

Cheryl L. O'Connor

John A Vogt

Theodore Roethke

Thomas P Quinn, Jr

Donald E. Bradley

Ritka Singh

Tomio B Narita

Nathan Andrew Searles

 

Court Documents

32 #1

Declaration

#32

(#32) STATUS REPORT Joint re: Deposition Scheduling filed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Veggian, Lauren) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Theodore Roethke on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Solutions, LLC (Attorney Theodore Roethke added to party Equifax Information Solutions, LLC(pty:dft))(Roethke, Theodore) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

30 #3

Proposed Order

30 #2

Declaration

30 #1

Memorandum

#30

(#30) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/29/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney John A Vogt added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Vogt, John) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

#29

(#29) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Michael Kushner at mkushner@jonesday.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

#28

(#28) MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference (not held) before Judge David O. Carter. The case is called. The Court and counsel confer. The Court ORDERS depositions be completed before status conference set for May 15, 2023 at 8:30 AM. The Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to May 15, 2023 at 8:30 AM. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (twdb) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on February 22, 2023. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#3

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on February 22, 2023. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#2

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on February 22, 2023. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka, upon Defendant Hunt and Henriques, LLP served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Scott Hunt, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/1/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) STATUS REPORT Joint re: Deposition Scheduling filed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Veggian, Lauren) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Theodore Roethke on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Solutions, LLC (Attorney Theodore Roethke added to party Equifax Information Solutions, LLC(pty:dft))(Roethke, Theodore) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/29/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney John A Vogt added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Vogt, John) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Michael Kushner at mkushner@jonesday.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference (not held) before Judge David O. Carter. The case is called. The Court and counsel confer. The Court ORDERS depositions be completed before status conference set for May 15, 2023 at 8:30 AM. The Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to May 15, 2023 at 8:30 AM. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (twdb) (Entered: 04/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) TEXT ONLY ORDER By District Judge David O. Carter DENYING REQUEST for Leave to Appear for Remotely at Scheduling Conference #26 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REQUEST for Leave to Appear for Remotely at Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Singh, Ritka) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A..(Summerfield, Adam) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Equifax Information Solutions, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka, upon Defendant Hunt and Henriques, LLP served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Scott Hunt, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/1/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Trans Union LLC, upon Defendant Trans Union LLC served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/25/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka, upon Defendant Equifax Information Solutions, LLC served on 1/24/2023, answer due 2/14/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/25/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF Summons Executed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Emanuel Jacobo, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/25/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka, upon Defendant Bank of America, N.A. served on 1/23/2023, answer due 2/13/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Emanuel Jacobo, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/25/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Solutions, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Hunt and Henriques, LLP, Trans Union LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Fereydoun Shoraka. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/5/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on February 22, 2023. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc; Central Source LLC; Online Data Exchange LLC; New Management Services LLC; VantageScore Solutions LLC; Opt-Out Services LLC. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2022-01295549-CU-CR-NJC Receipt No: ACACDC-34833907 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Michael Akira Kushner added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kushner, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less