This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2019 at 08:03:08 (UTC).

Feltz v. Vann

Case Summary

On 07/17/2019 Feltz filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Vann. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda K. Sannes and Daniel J. Stewart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-00854

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brenda K. Sannes

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Stewart

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ryan Feltz

Altona, NY 12910

Respondent

Mary Vann

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ELECTRONIC NOTICE AND CERTIFICATION sent to US Court of Appeals re #14 Notice of Appeal (nas, ) (Entered: 09/01/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Order, #10 Judgment by Ryan Feltz. (nas, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

12 #1

envelope

#12

(#12) Submission in support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ryan Feltz. (Attachments: #1 envelope)[document rec'd in Plattsburgh on 8/6/19](nas, ) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

11 #1

envelope

#11

(#11) Submission in support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ryan Feltz. (Attachments: #1 envelope)[rec'd in Plattsburgh Office on 8/5/19](nas, ) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#10

(#10) JUDGMENT entered dismissing the action in accordance with the 8/6/19 Decision and Order of Judge Sannes.{judgment served via regular mail on petitioner} (nas) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#9

(#9) DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that the Judgment entered is VACATED and the Clerk of the Court is directed to re-open this matter and restore it to the Court's active docket. ORDERED that petitioner's IFP Application, Dkt. No. #4 , is DENIED AS MOOT because he has already remitted the statutory filing fee, Dkt. Entry for Pet. ORDERED that both the petition, Dkt. No. 1, and amended petition, Dkt. No. 8, suffer from the same deficiencies. Accordingly, both are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust available state court remedies. ORDERED that petitioner's requests to appoint counsel (Pet. at 4, 16-17, 23, 36, 39, 42; Dkt. No. 5) are similarly DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and with a right to renew pending re-filing of the habeas petition. ORDERED that no certificate of appealability ("COA") shall issue in this case because petitioner has failed to make a "substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2). Any further request for a COA must be addressed tothe Court of Appeals (Fed. R. App. P. 22(b)). Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 8/6/19. {order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

8 #3

envelope

8 #2

cover letter

8 #1

Exhibit(s)

#8

(#8) AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ryan Feltz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 cover letter, #3 envelope)[document rec'd in Plattsburgh Office on 7/31/19}(nas, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#7

(#7) Addendum to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ryan Feltz. (nas, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ryan Feltz. [document rec'd in Plattsburgh office on 7/26/19] (nas, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

1 #3

envelope

1 #2

cover letter

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00 - receipt # PLT00374) filed by Ryan Feltz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 cover letter, #3 envelope)(nas, ) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USCA Case Number 19-2647 for #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Ryan Feltz. (nas, ) (Entered: 09/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ELECTRONIC NOTICE AND CERTIFICATION sent to US Court of Appeals re #14 Notice of Appeal (nas, ) (Entered: 09/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Order, #10 Judgment by Ryan Feltz. (nas, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number PLT000382. [Money to be refunded]. (rep) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • (#13) TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Petitioner's submissions (Dkt. Nos. 11 & 12) which related to relief previously denied by the Court's prior Order dated August 6, 2019 (Dkt. No. 9) and which apparently crossed in the mail with said Order. The Court has reviewed Petitioner's submissions and finds no basis to alter its prior ruling. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve Petitioner with an updated docket report. The Court advises Petitioner that the Court docket is not intended to serve as a repository for his records; and, moreover, the Court will not review documents except to the extent that Petitioner specifically identifies and references them in connection with a properly filed motion or petition. Moreover, in accordance with the Local Rules, the Petitioner is reminded that all pertinent documents to be filed in this action should be mailed to John Domurad, Clerk; U.S. District Court, Northern District of New York; P.O. Box 7367; 100 South Clinton Street; Syracuse, New York 13261-7367. Authorized by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 8/13/19. {text order and docket sheet served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Submission in support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ryan Feltz. (Attachments: #1 envelope)[document rec'd in Plattsburgh on 8/6/19](nas, ) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Submission in support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ryan Feltz. (Attachments: #1 envelope)[rec'd in Plattsburgh Office on 8/5/19](nas, ) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) JUDGMENT entered dismissing the action in accordance with the 8/6/19 Decision and Order of Judge Sannes.{judgment served via regular mail on petitioner} (nas) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that the Judgment entered is VACATED and the Clerk of the Court is directed to re-open this matter and restore it to the Court's active docket. ORDERED that petitioner's IFP Application, Dkt. No. #4 , is DENIED AS MOOT because he has already remitted the statutory filing fee, Dkt. Entry for Pet. ORDERED that both the petition, Dkt. No. 1, and amended petition, Dkt. No. 8, suffer from the same deficiencies. Accordingly, both are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust available state court remedies. ORDERED that petitioner's requests to appoint counsel (Pet. at 4, 16-17, 23, 36, 39, 42; Dkt. No. 5) are similarly DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and with a right to renew pending re-filing of the habeas petition. ORDERED that no certificate of appealability ("COA") shall issue in this case because petitioner has failed to make a "substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2). Any further request for a COA must be addressed tothe Court of Appeals (Fed. R. App. P. 22(b)). Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 8/6/19. {order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ryan Feltz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 cover letter, #3 envelope)[document rec'd in Plattsburgh Office on 7/31/19}(nas, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Addendum to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ryan Feltz. (nas, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter from Feltz enclosing Exhibit T.{document rec'd 7/26/19] (nas, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Ryan Feltz. [document rec'd in Plattsburgh office on 7/26/19] (nas, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ryan Feltz. [document rec'd in Plattsburgh office on 7/26/19] (nas, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ***vacated**** JUDGMENT entered dismissing the action without prejudice in accordance with the 7/30/19 Decision and Order of Judge Sannes.{judgment served via regular mail on petitioner} (nas) Modified on 8/6/2019 (nas, ). (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that the petition, Dkt. No. 1, is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust available state court remedies. ORDERED that petitioner's request to appoint counsel (Pet. at 4, 16-17, 23, 36, 39, 42) is similarly DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and with a right to renew pending refilling of the habeas petition. ORDERED that no certificate of appealability ("COA") shall issue in this case because petitioner has failed to make a "substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2). Any further request for a COA must be addressed to the Court of Appeals (Fed. R. App. P. 22(b)). Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 7/30/19. {order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas, ) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number PLT000376 [money to be refunded] (nas, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00 - receipt # PLT00374) filed by Ryan Feltz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 cover letter, #3 envelope)(nas, ) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less