This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 08:52:40 (UTC).

Feltner v. 3M Company

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Feltner filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Audrey G. Fleissig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01525

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Audrey G. Fleissig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Quinton Feltner

Defendant and Counter Claimant

3M Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Timm W. Schowalter

Attorney at SANDBERG PHOENIX PC - St Louis

600 Washington Ave., 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101-1313

Benjamin R. Wesselschmidt

Attorney at SANDBERG PHOENIX PC - St Louis

600 Washington Ave., 15Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101-1313

Ross Boden

Attorney at SANDBERG PHOENIX PC - Kansas City

4600 Madison Ave., Suite 1000

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Stacie L. Linguist

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER LLP - Dallas

1717 Main St., Suite 5400

Dallas, TX 75201

Kerry L. Bundy

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER LLP - Minneapolis

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S. Seventh St.

Minneapolis, MN 55402

David Archer

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER LLP - Minneapolis

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S. Seventh St.

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Kate Middleton

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER LLP - Minneapolis

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 S. Seventh St.

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jeffrey L. Schultz

Attorney at ARMSTRONG TEASDALE LLP - St Louis

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT Neutral: Neuner Jr., Francis X.. Date of Conference: 12/3/2020. The parties participated in good faith. The parties achieved a settlement.(JMP) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#34

(#34) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file, on or before January 4, 2021, dismissal papers dismissing the case. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of the case by the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DISMISSED without prejudice as moot, and the hearing set for December 18, 2020 and related deadlines are VACATED. ( Dismissal Paper(s) due by 1/4/2021.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/4/2020. (AFO) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

31 #1

Certificate of Good Standing Boden

#31

(#31) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ross A. Boden. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8312894) by Plaintiff Quinton Feltner. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Boden)(Boden, Ross) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#30

(#30) PROTECTIVE ORDER [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/1/2020. (AFO) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

29 #1

Exhibit Stipulated Protocol for Producing Documents and ESI During Expedited Dis

#29

(#29) NOTICE Expedited Discovery ESI Protocol: by Defendant 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protocol for Producing Documents and ESI During Expedited Discovery)(Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

28 #1

Exhibit Proposed Protective Order

#28

(#28) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Quinton Feltner Process Server: Robert Pedroli (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Schowalter, Timm) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #7

Original Filing Form

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Oct. 22 letter from OPC

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Oct. 20 Letter from Timm Schowalter

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Oct. 16 Limited Waiver Letter from OP

1 #2

Exhibit 2 Oct. 1 Resignation Letter

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Employment Agreement

#1

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Quinton Feltner by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Feltner Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Feltner Resignation Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Specialty Sales Leader, PEG Job Description, #4 Exhibit 4 - Snell and Wilmer 10/16/2020 letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Sandberg Phoenix 10/20/2020 Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - Snell and Wilmer 10/22/2020 Letter)(Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ADR COMPLIANCE REPORT Neutral: Neuner Jr., Francis X.. Date of Conference: 12/3/2020. The parties participated in good faith. The parties achieved a settlement.(JMP) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file, on or before January 4, 2021, dismissal papers dismissing the case. Failure to comply may result in the dismissal of the case by the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DISMISSED without prejudice as moot, and the hearing set for December 18, 2020 and related deadlines are VACATED. ( Dismissal Paper(s) due by 1/4/2021.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/4/2020. (AFO) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docket(#33) Docket Text ORDER: After hearing from the parties, the status conference set for today, December 4, 2020 at 11:00 am is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/4/2020. (AFO) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Docket Text ORDER Re: #31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ross A. Boden by Plaintiff Quinton Feltner; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/2/2020. (AFO) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ross A. Boden. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8312894) by Plaintiff Quinton Feltner. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Boden)(Boden, Ross) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) PROTECTIVE ORDER [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/1/2020. (AFO) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE Expedited Discovery ESI Protocol: by Defendant 3M Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protocol for Producing Documents and ESI During Expedited Discovery)(Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order)(Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) PLAINTIFF/COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANT QUINTON FELTNER'S ANSWER to Counterclaim by Quinton Feltner.(Schowalter, Timm) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appointment of Neutral. Neutral name: Neuner Jr., Francis X. Neutral selected by parties (CC: Neutral)(KJS) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kerry L. Bundy. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8271253) by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bundy, Kerry) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant 3M Company. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: 3M Company is a publicly held corporation and no publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of 3M Companys stock.,. (Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Quinton Feltner by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Feltner Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Feltner Resignation Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Specialty Sales Leader, PEG Job Description, #4 Exhibit 4 - Snell and Wilmer 10/16/2020 letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Sandberg Phoenix 10/20/2020 Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - Snell and Wilmer 10/22/2020 Letter)(Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Schultz for Defendant 3M Company. (Schultz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT re Case Opening Notification, Proof of Service - Summons to 3M Company by Plaintiff Quinton Feltner. (Schowalter, Timm) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Timm W. Schowalter. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin R. Wesselschmidt for Plaintiff Quinton Feltner. (Wesselschmidt, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Timm W. Schowalter for Plaintiff Quinton Feltner. (Schowalter, Timm) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Quinton Feltner Process Server: Robert Pedroli (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Schowalter, Timm) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against defendant 3M Company with receipt number AMOEDC-8236206, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Quinton Feltner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 Oct. 1 Resignation Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Oct. 16 Limited Waiver Letter from OP, #4 Exhibit 4 - Oct. 20 Letter from Timm Schowalter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Oct. 22 letter from OPC, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Original Filing Form)(Schowalter, Timm) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate Middleton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey L. Schultz