This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2021 at 06:57:44 (UTC).

Fellows v. Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Fellows filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Depuy Synthes Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph M. Hood and Hanly A. Ingram. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00220

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph M. Hood

Referral Judge

Hanly A. Ingram

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandra Lee Fellows

Defendants

Depuy Synthes Products, Inc.

Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Escum L. Moore, III

Attorney at Moore & Moore, PLLC

141 Prosperous Place, Suite 22B

Lexington, KY 40509

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph A. Wright

Attorney at Thompson, Miller & Simpson, PLC - Louisville

734 W. Main Street, Suite 400

Louisville, KY 40202

W. Kennedy Simpson

Attorney at Thompson, Miller & Simpson, PLC - Louisville

734 W. Main Street, Suite 400

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER: It is ORDERED that this matter is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Hanly Ingram. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 9/29/2021.(KM)cc: COR (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures is due by 10/15/21 for pla - dft by 10/29/21; (2) Discovery due by 4/15/2021; (3) max of 30 interrogatories by each party due in 45 days unless otherwise agreed; (4) max of 30 requests for admission by each party due in 45 days unless otherwise agreed; (5) no limit to the number of depos; (6) pla disclose experts & provide info required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26 by 1/15/22 w/depos to be completed w/in 6 weeks after discl; dft by 3/1/22; (7) Amended Pleadings & Motion to Join Additional Parties due by 1/28/2022; (8) parties supplement all discl & responses as required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(E); (9) Dispositive Motions & motions to exclude expert testimony due by 5/1/2022; (10) Motions in limine made pursuant to Daubert is due 90 days before trial; (11) discovery disputes REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins; (12) court encourages early & economic case resolution including mediation; (13) motions for extensions of time or to modify this scheduling order shall be referred to the undersigned for disposition; (14) parties shall conduct discovery pursuant to Federal & Joint Local Rules; (15) the scope of disc & parties' obligations in disc are governed by Fed Rules; (15) motion practice shall be governed by Local Rules except as provided in this order; (16) pretrial filings are due 10 days before final PTC; (17) FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 8/3/2022 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood; (18) JURY TRIAL set for 9/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood (5-6 days). Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/24/21.(KJR)cc: COR,JC,D (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#6

(#6) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Simpson, W.) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER: 1) w/in 21 days, parties meet to discuss nature and basis of claims and defenses and possibilities for prompt resolution of case, make FRCP 26(a) (1) disclosures and develop proposed discovery plan; 2) w/in 10 days after meeting, file joint status report as outlined in Order; 3) advise the Court at the time of the submission of the joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners with which it is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/9/21.(JLM)cc: COR (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#4

(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc... (Simpson, W.) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc..(Simpson, W.) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED) ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5049072) filed by Sandra Lee Fellows. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: It is ORDERED that this matter is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Hanly Ingram. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 9/29/2021.(KM)cc: COR (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures is due by 10/15/21 for pla - dft by 10/29/21; (2) Discovery due by 4/15/2021; (3) max of 30 interrogatories by each party due in 45 days unless otherwise agreed; (4) max of 30 requests for admission by each party due in 45 days unless otherwise agreed; (5) no limit to the number of depos; (6) pla disclose experts & provide info required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26 by 1/15/22 w/depos to be completed w/in 6 weeks after discl; dft by 3/1/22; (7) Amended Pleadings & Motion to Join Additional Parties due by 1/28/2022; (8) parties supplement all discl & responses as required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(E); (9) Dispositive Motions & motions to exclude expert testimony due by 5/1/2022; (10) Motions in limine made pursuant to Daubert is due 90 days before trial; (11) discovery disputes REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins; (12) court encourages early & economic case resolution including mediation; (13) motions for extensions of time or to modify this scheduling order shall be referred to the undersigned for disposition; (14) parties shall conduct discovery pursuant to Federal & Joint Local Rules; (15) the scope of disc & parties' obligations in disc are governed by Fed Rules; (15) motion practice shall be governed by Local Rules except as provided in this order; (16) pretrial filings are due 10 days before final PTC; (17) FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 8/3/2022 at 10:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood; (18) JURY TRIAL set for 9/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in LEXINGTON before Judge Joseph M. Hood (5-6 days). Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/24/21.(KJR)cc: COR,JC,D (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (GLD) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Simpson, W.) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: 1) w/in 21 days, parties meet to discuss nature and basis of claims and defenses and possibilities for prompt resolution of case, make FRCP 26(a) (1) disclosures and develop proposed discovery plan; 2) w/in 10 days after meeting, file joint status report as outlined in Order; 3) advise the Court at the time of the submission of the joint report of all parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners with which it is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/9/21.(JLM)cc: COR (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAttorney Update. Attorney Joseph A. Wright for Depuy Synthes Products, Inc.,Joseph A. Wright for Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. added. (JLM) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc... (Simpson, W.) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc..(Simpson, W.) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketConflict Check run. (JLM) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED) ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5049072) filed by Sandra Lee Fellows. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLM) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph A. Wright