Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2020 at 08:21:14 (UTC).

Felling v. Homeaway.com, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Felling filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Homeaway com, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gloria M. Navarro and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02014

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Felling

Defendants

Marco Jimmerson

Generali Global Assistance, Inc.

Devoyious Mark

Homeaway.com, Inc.

HomeAway, Inc.

Generali U.S. Branch

Dmarco Jimmerson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Krista N. Albregts

353 East Bonneville Avenue, 551, Las Vegas

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant Attorneys

Janice M Michaels

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning & Berman

2881 Buisness Park Court, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89128

Jacquelyn N. Witt

Attorney at Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman LLP

2881 Business Park Court, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89128-9020

Joel Edward Tasca

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 900

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Maria A. Gall

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 900

Las Vegas, NV 89135

 

Court Documents

20 #8

Exhibit AAA Consumer Arbitration Rules

20 #7

Exhibit HomeAway Terms

20 #6

Exhibit Example Webpage - Acceptance of Terms and Privacy Policy

20 #5

Exhibit Example Webpage - Entry of Address

20 #4

Exhibit Example Webpage - Listing of Beds and Baths

20 #3

Exhibit Example Webpage - Landing Page

20 #2

Exhibit Michael Felling Member Profile

20 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Chris Walk

#20

(#20) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Homeaway.com, Inc.. Responses due by 1/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Chris Walk, #2 Exhibit Michael Felling Member Profile, #3 Exhibit Example Webpage - Landing Page, #4 Exhibit Example Webpage - Listing of Beds and Baths, #5 Exhibit Example Webpage - Entry of Address, #6 Exhibit Example Webpage - Acceptance of Terms and Privacy Policy, #7 Exhibit HomeAway Terms, #8 Exhibit AAA Consumer Arbitration Rules) (Gall, Maria) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#9

(#9) First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant HomeAway, Inc.. (Gall, Maria) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#6

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #6 . Attorney Jacquelyn N. Witt is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by HomeAway, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Expedia, Inc., Corporate Parent Expedia Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Vrbo Holdings, Inc. for HomeAway, Inc. added. (Gall, Maria) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#2

(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/2/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/17/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit Rejection Notice

1 #3

Exhibit Process Server Affidavit

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Filings, Including Pleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#13) Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant HomeAway, Inc.. (Gall, Maria) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Homeaway.com, Inc.. Responses due by 1/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Chris Walk, #2 Exhibit Michael Felling Member Profile, #3 Exhibit Example Webpage - Landing Page, #4 Exhibit Example Webpage - Listing of Beds and Baths, #5 Exhibit Example Webpage - Entry of Address, #6 Exhibit Example Webpage - Acceptance of Terms and Privacy Policy, #7 Exhibit HomeAway Terms, #8 Exhibit AAA Consumer Arbitration Rules) (Gall, Maria) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Homeaway.com, Inc.. Homeaway.com, Inc. waiver sent on 12/15/2020, answer due 2/13/2021. (Gall, Maria) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Summons Issued as to Dmarco Jimmerson, Devoyious Mark re #15 Amended Complaint. (DRS) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Dmarco Jimmerson by Plaintiff Michael Felling. (Albregts, Krista) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Devoyius Mark by Plaintiff Michael Felling. (Albregts, Krista) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Michael Felling. Adds and removes parties. (Albregts, Krista) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Amended Complaint deadline is reset to 12/9/2020; Defendants shall respond to the to-be-filed amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of its filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant HomeAway, Inc.. (Gall, Maria) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant HomeAway, Inc.. (Gall, Maria) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant HomeAway, Inc.. (Gall, Maria) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant HomeAway, Inc.. (Gall, Maria) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Jacquelyn N. Witt is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #6 . Attorney Jacquelyn N. Witt is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Generali Global Assistance, Inc.. (Michaels, Janice) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by HomeAway, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Expedia, Inc., Corporate Parent Expedia Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Vrbo Holdings, Inc. for HomeAway, Inc. added. (Gall, Maria) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 -2. Attorney Krista N. Albregts is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified on 11/2/2020 (AF). (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/2/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/17/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-821668-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6238195) by Homeaway.com, Inc.. Proof of service due by 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Filings, Including Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Process Server Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Rejection Notice) (Gall, Maria) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Generali U.S. Branch is a litigant

Latest cases where Generali Global Assistance Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where HOMEAWAY.COM INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant