This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2019 at 07:11:14 (UTC).

FELLER v. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 FELLER filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Esther Salas and Cathy L. Waldor. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14857

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MR. JARED FELLER

Defendants

LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON

THE TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY BENEFIT PROGRAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BONNY G. RAFEL

Attorney at Bonny G. Rafel, LLC

17 Hanover Road, Suite 410, P.O. Box 97

Florham Park, NJ 07932-0097

Defendant Attorney

STEVEN J. SILVER

Attorney at OGLETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK & STEWART, P.C.

2 Monument Square, 7Th Floor

Portland, ME 04101

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER that the case is administratively terminated under Local Rule 41.1(b), all current deadlines are vacated, and the parties shall file dismissal papers, or seek an extension of the period if the administrative processis still ongoing, within 120 days.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/5/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Letter from Bonny Rafel, Esq. and Steven J. Silver, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, STEVEN) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JARED FELLER. THE TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY BENEFIT PROGRAM waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (RAFEL, BONNY) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; that Liberty shall have to and including September 9, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/8/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON identifying The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company; Lincoln National Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (SILVER, STEVEN) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, STEVEN) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JARED FELLER. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (RAFEL, BONNY) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON, THE TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY BENEFIT PROGRAM. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

1 #3

Summons As to Tribune Publishing Co. Program

1 #2

Summons As to Liberty Life

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON, THE TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY BENEFIT PROGRAM ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9801082), filed by JARED FELLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons As to Liberty Life, #3 Summons As to Tribune Publishing Co. Program)(RAFEL, BONNY) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER that the case is administratively terminated under Local Rule 41.1(b), all current deadlines are vacated, and the parties shall file dismissal papers, or seek an extension of the period if the administrative processis still ongoing, within 120 days.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/5/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter from Bonny Rafel, Esq. and Steven J. Silver, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, STEVEN) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JARED FELLER. THE TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY BENEFIT PROGRAM waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (RAFEL, BONNY) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; that Liberty shall have to and including September 9, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/8/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, . Motion set for 9/3/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON identifying The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company; Lincoln National Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (SILVER, STEVEN) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SILVER, STEVEN) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by JARED FELLER. LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (RAFEL, BONNY) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON, THE TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY BENEFIT PROGRAM. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (eu, ) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON, THE TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY BENEFIT PROGRAM ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9801082), filed by JARED FELLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons As to Liberty Life, #3 Summons As to Tribune Publishing Co. Program)(RAFEL, BONNY) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BONNY G. RAFEL(Designation Retained)