This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2022 at 07:47:42 (UTC).

Iosilevich v. MSC Cruises (USA) et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 Iosilevich filed an Other lawsuit against MSC Cruises USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Margo K. Brodie and Roanne L. Mann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01897

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FELIKS IOSILEVICH BY POA ILYA FELIKSOVICH IOSILEVICH

Defendants

MSC CRUISES (USA)

MSC CRUISES S.A.

RICHARD SASSO

PIERFRANCESCO VAGO

RUBEN RODRIGUEZ

GIOVANNI ONORATA

SMART CRUISER HOLDINGS

LLC DBA SMARTCRUISER.COM

OASIS TRAVEL NETWORK

LLC DBA OASIS TRAVEL NETWORK

CITIGROUP INC.

CITIBANK N.A

JPMORGAN CHASE & CO

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

VISA U.S.A. INC.

MASTERCARD INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Althea Daley

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1675 Broadway, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Nina Rachel Kanovitch Schiffer

Attorney at Holwell Shuster & Goldberg

425 Lexington Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITIBANK N.A, CITIGROUP INC. (Daley, Althea) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Nina Rachel Kanovitch Schiffer on behalf of Visa U.S.A. Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Kanovitch Schiffer, Nina) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#6

(#6) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Visa U.S.A. Inc.. (Kanovitch Schiffer, Nina) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Visa U.S.A. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Visa Inc. for Visa U.S.A. Inc.. (Kanovitch Schiffer, Nina) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letter Motion served on Feliks Iosilevich on 4/11/2022, filed by Visa U.S.A. Inc.. (Kanovitch Schiffer, Nina) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Althea Daley on behalf of Mastercard International Incorporated (aty to be noticed) (Daley, Althea) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mastercard International Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Mastercard Incorporated for Mastercard International Incorporated. (Daley, Althea) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#11

(#11) First MOTION for pre motion conference Requesting Court's Permission to File Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Citibank N.A., Citigroup Inc., Mastercard International Incorporated. (Daley, Althea) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice between Plaintiff and Defendants Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc., Mastercard International Incorporated and Visa U.S.A. Inc. by Citibank N.A., Citigroup Inc., Mastercard International Incorporated (Daley, Althea) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (Piper, Francine) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice between Plaintiff and Defendants Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc., Mastercard International Incorporated and Visa U.S.A. Inc. by Citibank N.A., Citigroup Inc., Mastercard International Incorporated (Daley, Althea) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER re #6 and #11 Defendants' motions for pre-motion conferences. The Court orders Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' motions on or before April 20, 2022. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/13/2022. (Okonta, Patricia) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First MOTION for pre motion conference Requesting Court's Permission to File Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Citibank N.A., Citigroup Inc., Mastercard International Incorporated. (Daley, Althea) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mastercard International Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Mastercard Incorporated for Mastercard International Incorporated. (Daley, Althea) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Althea Daley on behalf of Mastercard International Incorporated (aty to be noticed) (Daley, Althea) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letter Motion served on Feliks Iosilevich on 4/11/2022, filed by Visa U.S.A. Inc.. (Kanovitch Schiffer, Nina) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Visa U.S.A. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Visa Inc. for Visa U.S.A. Inc.. (Kanovitch Schiffer, Nina) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Visa U.S.A. Inc.. (Kanovitch Schiffer, Nina) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Nina Rachel Kanovitch Schiffer on behalf of Visa U.S.A. Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Kanovitch Schiffer, Nina) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie for all further proceedings. Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 4/6/2022. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITIBANK N.A, CITIGROUP INC. (Daley, Althea) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITIBANK N.A, CITIGROUP INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-15439532) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Daley, Althea) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mastercard International Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Visa is a litigant

Latest cases where Citigroup Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where American International Group, Inc. is a litigant