This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:04:04 (UTC).

Feldman Melo v. USCIS et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Feldman Melo filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against USCIS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-08001

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sylvia Feldman Melo

Defendants

USCIS

Kevin K. McAleenan

Mark Koumans

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Chad Wolf

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Martin James Lawler

Attorney at Lawler & Lawler

505 Sansome Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Namgiao Do

Attorney at Lawler and Lawler

505 Sansome Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#8

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sylvia Feldman Melo.. (Lawler, Martin) (Filed on 12/26/2019) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/7/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia Feldman Melo. All Defendants. Martin Lawler (Lawler, Martin) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketELECTRONIC FILING ERROR. No Caption Page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement and re-filed in its entirety. re #6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia Feldman Melo. All Defendants. Martin Lawler (Lawler, Martin) (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia Feldman Melo. All Defendants. Martin Lawler (Lawler, Martin) (Filed on 12/13/2019) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Mark Koumans, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Lawler, Martin) (Filed on 12/10/2019) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/19/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13953797.). Filed bySylvia Feldman Melo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lawler, Martin) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.