This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2021 at 09:41:37 (UTC).

Rhonda Felder v. Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Rhonda Felder filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Sheri Pym. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00421

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rhonda Felder

Defendants

Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc.

Schneider National, Inc.

DOES 1 to 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sandra H Castro

Attorney at Law Offices of Sandra Castro Inc

3200 Inland Empire Boulevard Suite 265

Ontario, CA 91764

Kristen B Brown

Attorney at Law Offices of Kristen Brown

900 West 17Th Street Suite C

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Kathleen Alexys Castro

Attorney at Law Offices of Sandra Castro Inc

3200 Inland Empire Boulevard Suite 265

Ontario, CA 91764

Defendant Attorneys

Sabrina A Beldner

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1800 Century Park East 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1501

Amy E Beverlin

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1800 Century Park East, 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION #12 by Judge John W. Holcomb. All further proceedings in this action shall be and hereby are stayed pending completion of arbitration, see 9 U.S.C. 3. Within 14 days of the completion of the arbitration, the Parties are DIRECTED to file a Joint Report advising the Court of such resolution. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case administratively. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (iv) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Arbitration filed by Defendant Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beverlin, Amy) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS SCHNEIDER NATIONAL, INC. by Judge John W. Holcomb #10 Having reviewed the Stipulation, and finding good cause exists for the relief requested therein, the Stipulation is hereby GRANTED as follows: Defendant SNI shall be and hereby is dismissed from this lawsuit without prejudice. Defendants shall not seek attorneys' fees or costs associated with representation of SNI (See document for further details) (yl) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Schneider National, Inc. filed by Defendant Schneider National, Inc., Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beverlin, Amy) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 03/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 03/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Schneider National, Inc. answer now due 4/6/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Schneider National, Inc.; Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc..(Beverlin, Amy) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc. in San Bernardino Superior Court on 3/5/2021, attached as Exhibit 8. (jtil) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rhonda Felder in San Bernardino Superior Court on 8/12/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Angie Sheedlo re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc., Schneider National, Inc.. (Beldner, Sabrina) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc., Schneider National, Inc., (Beldner, Sabrina) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc., Schneider National, Inc.. (Beldner, Sabrina) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS2016544 Receipt No: ACACDC-30881003 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Schneider National, Inc., Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Trial Setting Conference, #5 Certificate of Assignment, #6 Initial Trial Setting Conference Order, #7 Minute Order, #8 Answer) (Attorney Sabrina A Beldner added to party Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sabrina A Beldner added to party Schneider National, Inc.(pty:dft))(Beldner, Sabrina) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schneider Logistics Transloading and Distribution, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Schneider National, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy Elaine Beverlin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sabrina Alexis Beldner