This case was last updated from PACER on 05/09/2021 at 10:29:39 (UTC).

Feist et al v. Krotseng et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Feist filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Krotseng. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Clare R. Hochhalter and Daniel M. Traynor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00055

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    North Dakota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

Presiding Judge

Daniel M. Traynor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mary Feist

Joey Almer

Defendants

Marsha V. Krotseng

Morgan L. Krotseng

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason C. Tarasek

Attorney at Thompson Tarasek Lee-O'Halloran, PLLC

7101 York Avenue South, Suite 255

Edina, MN 55435

Defendant Attorney

Zachary E. Pelham

Attorney at Pearce Durick PLLC

314 East Thayer Avenue, Po Box 400

Bismarck, ND 58502-0400

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Joey Almer, Mary Feist. (jb) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Marsha V. Krotseng, Morgan L. Krotseng. (mf) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Mary Feist. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/25/2021. (js) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Joey Almer. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/25/2021. (js) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Morgan L. Krotseng. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/25/2021. (js) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Marsha V. Krotseng. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/25/2021. (js) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#3

(#3) *RESTRICTED - FILED AS TO BOTH PARTIES* NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Joey Almer, Mary Feist. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/24/2021. (mf) Modified on 3/11/2021 to restrict access. (js) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#2

(#2) *RESTRICTED - FILED AS TO BOTH PARTIES* NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Marsha V. Krotseng, Morgan L. Krotseng. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/24/2021. (mf) Modified on 3/11/2021 to restrict access. (js) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit A - Pleadings from State Court

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marsha V. Krotseng, Morgan L. Krotseng from Burleigh County, case number 08-2021-cv-0506. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 121000452 filed by Marsha V. Krotseng, Morgan L. Krotseng. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Pleadings from State Court)(mf) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Joey Almer, Mary Feist. (jb) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docket(#9) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding Judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral Judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding Judge. (mf) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Marsha V. Krotseng, Morgan L. Krotseng. (mf) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 NOTICE of Direct Assignment. Restricted access to document and re-filed as to individual parties at #4 and #5 ; #3 NOTICE of Direct Assignment. Restricted access to document and re-filed as to individual parties at #6 and #7 . (js) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Mary Feist. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/25/2021. (js) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Joey Almer. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/25/2021. (js) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Morgan L. Krotseng. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/25/2021. (js) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Marsha V. Krotseng. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/25/2021. (js) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *RESTRICTED - FILED AS TO BOTH PARTIES* NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Joey Almer, Mary Feist. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/24/2021. (mf) Modified on 3/11/2021 to restrict access. (js) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) *RESTRICTED - FILED AS TO BOTH PARTIES* NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Marsha V. Krotseng, Morgan L. Krotseng. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/24/2021. (mf) Modified on 3/11/2021 to restrict access. (js) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marsha V. Krotseng, Morgan L. Krotseng from Burleigh County, case number 08-2021-cv-0506. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 121000452 filed by Marsha V. Krotseng, Morgan L. Krotseng. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Pleadings from State Court)(mf) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason C. Tarasek(Designation Retained)