This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:53:49 (UTC).

Fehr v. Trans Union LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Fehr filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Trans Union LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02886

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tanya R Fehr

Defendant

Trans Union LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven W Thornton

Attorney at Westerburg & Thornton PC

10440 N Central Expwy, Suite 800

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorney

Sarah Holt Sublett

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC

6900 N Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan filed by Tanya R Fehr. (Thornton, Steven) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 21 days of the date of this Order and, report to the Court within 21 days after the conference. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/13/2019) (svc) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 95th District Court, Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-19-17778 filed by Trans Union LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10460691) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index and State Court Records, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Sublett, Sarah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Trans Union LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sublett, Sarah) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Index and State Court Records

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion for Trans Union LLC. (Sublett, Sarah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan filed by Tanya R Fehr. (Thornton, Steven) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 21 days of the date of this Order and, report to the Court within 21 days after the conference. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/13/2019) (svc) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Trans Union LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sublett, Sarah) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cdt) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion for Trans Union LLC. (Sublett, Sarah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 95th District Court, Dallas County, Texas, case number DC-19-17778 filed by Trans Union LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10460691) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Index and State Court Records, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Sublett, Sarah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less