This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:37:14 (UTC).

Feeler v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Feeler filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl Barbier and Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-11000

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl Barbier

Referral Judge

Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peggy Ann Feeler

Defendants

BP America Production Company

BP Exploration & Production, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Nations

Attorney at Nations Law Firm

9703 Richmond Ave, Suite 200

Houston, TX 77042

Defendant Attorneys

Scott C. Seiler

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Georgia Lee Lucier

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP (Houston)

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Catherine Pyune McEldowney

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Don Keller Haycraft

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Devin C. Reid

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Kevin Michael Hodges

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7692907) filed by Peggy Ann Feeler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Peggy Ann Feeler(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#3

(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

3 #2

Exhibit B

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7692907) filed by Peggy Ann Feeler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Peggy Ann Feeler(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.