This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2022 at 16:00:51 (UTC).

Feduccia v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 Feduccia filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire Casualty Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05226

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Feduccia

Defendant

State Farm Fire & Casualty Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin Shawn Brashear

Attorney at Brashear Law L L C

P O Box 5876

Lake Charles, LA 70605

Defendant Attorneys

Todd M Ammons

Attorney at Stockwell Sievert et al

127 Broad St 4Th Fl

Lake Charles, LA 70601

David L Morgan

Attorney at Stockwell Sievert et al

127 Broad St 4Th Fl

Lake Charles, LA 70601

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (aty,Ammons, Todd) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #2

Exhibit B

#4

(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/23/2022. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Ammons, Todd) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#6

(#6) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/26/2022. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 9/26/2022. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.(aty,Ammons, Todd) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/23/2022. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. State Farm Fire & Casualty Co answer due 9/15/2022. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment No. 2 to Document No. #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (aty,Ammons, Todd) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu, LA, Case Number 2022-2780 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5266208) filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Attorney Todd M Ammons added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Company(pty:dft))(aty,Ammons, Todd) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David L Morgan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd M Ammons