3:21-CV-00356
12/21/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Other - Administrative Procedure Act
Jeffrey V Brown
Feds for Medical Freedom
Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees
Highland Engineering, Inc.
Raymond A. Beebe, Jr.
John Armbrust
N. Anne Atkinson
Julia Badger
Michael Ball
Craigan Biggs
Laura Brunstetter
Mark Canales
Michele Caramenico
Andrew Chamberland
David Clark
Diane Countryman
Kevin Dantuma
Jose Delgado
Jordan DeManss
George Demetriou
Keri Divilbiss
Jared M Kelson
Jonathan A Berry
Michael B Buschbacher
R. Trent McCotter
James Garland Gillingham
Proposed Order
Main Document
(#43) ORDER denying #40 Motion to Stay.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4) (Entered: 02/11/2022)
(#42) Order of USCA - PER CURIAM re: #37 Notice of Appeal; USCA No. 22-40043. It is ORDERED that Appellant's opposed motion to stay the injunction pending appeal is CARRIED WITH THE CASE, filed. (rnieto, 1) (Entered: 02/10/2022)
Main Document
Proposed Order
Exhibit Declaration of Jason Miller
Main Document
Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 22-40043 re: #37 Notice of Appeal, filed.(mperez, 1) (Entered: 01/28/2022)
Exhibit 151
Exhibit 139
Exhibit 95
Exhibit 94
Exhibit 67
Exhibit 1
Civil Cover Sheet
Exhibit A
(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27502819) filed by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
Docket(#44) Unopposed MOTION to Stay by John M. Tenaglia, The United States of America, United States Agency For International Development, Tom Vilsack, Marty Walsh, Janet Yellen, Shalanda D. Young, Jeffrey Zients, Department of Agriculture, Department of Commerce, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), Department of Interior, Department of Justice, Department of Labor, Department of State, Department of Transportation, Department of Treasury, Department of Veterans Affairs, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, Marcia Fudge, Merrick B. Garland, General Services Administration, Jennifer M. Granholm, Deb Haaland, Avril Haines, Daniel Hokanson, Karla S. Jackson, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Personnel Management, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Samantha Power, Gina M. Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Antony Blinken, Matthew C. Blum, William J. Burns, Pete Buttigieg, Robin Carnahan, Central Intelligence Agency, Kilolo Kijakazi, Jeffrey A. Koses, Alejandro Mayorkas, Denis McDonough, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Guard Bureau, Bill Nelson, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gillingham, James) (Entered: 02/17/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketElectronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #37 Notice of Appeal, to Jordan E. Pratt. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 22-40043), filed.(mperez, 1) (Entered: 02/16/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketElectronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #37 Notice of Appeal to Charles W. Scarborough. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 22-40043), filed.(mperez, 1) (Entered: 02/15/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#43) ORDER denying #40 Motion to Stay.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4) (Entered: 02/11/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketElectronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #37 Notice of Appeal to S. Carroll; G. Hamilton; R. T. McCotter; J. Pratt; C. Ross. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 22-40043), filed.(mperez, 1) (Entered: 02/10/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketElectronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #37 Notice of Appeal, USCA No. 22-40043, filed.(mperez, 1) (Entered: 02/10/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#42) Order of USCA - PER CURIAM re: #37 Notice of Appeal; USCA No. 22-40043. It is ORDERED that Appellant's opposed motion to stay the injunction pending appeal is CARRIED WITH THE CASE, filed. (rnieto, 1) (Entered: 02/10/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#41) RESPONSE in Opposition to #40 MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal, filed by Feds for Medical Freedom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 40)(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 02/01/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#40) MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin III, Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Antony Blinken, Matthew C. Blum, William J. Burns, Pete Buttigieg, Robin Carnahan, Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Agriculture, Department of Commerce, Department of Defense, Department of Energy, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD), Department of Interior, Department of Justice, Department of Labor, Department of State, Department of Transportation, Department of Treasury, Department of Veterans Affairs, Federal Acquisition Regulatory Council, Lesley A. Field, Marcia Fudge, Merrick B. Garland, General Services Administration, Jennifer M. Granholm, Deb Haaland, Avril Haines, Daniel Hokanson, Karla S. Jackson, Kilolo Kijakazi, Jeffrey A. Koses, Alejandro Mayorkas, Denis McDonough, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, National Guard Bureau, Bill Nelson, Office of Management and Budget, Office of Personnel Management, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Samantha Power, Gina M. Raimondo, Safer Federal Workforce Task Force, Social Security Administration, The United States of America, United States Agency For International Development, Tom Vilsack, Marty Walsh, Janet Yellen, Shalanda D. Young, Jeffrey Zients, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jason Miller, #2 Proposed Order)(Gillingham, James) (Entered: 01/28/2022)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Assignment of USCA No. 22-40043 re: #37 Notice of Appeal, filed.(mperez, 1) (Entered: 01/28/2022)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4) (Entered: 12/30/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit McCotter)(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 12/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) Agreed MOTION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 12/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York, filed.(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 12/29/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/9/2022 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3) (Entered: 12/23/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(CynthiaBenavides, 3) (Entered: 12/22/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York, filed. (McCotter, R.) (Entered: 12/22/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 EO14043, #2 Exhibit 2 Sept. 13 Task Force Employees, #3 Exhibit 3 Task Force FAQ Employees, #4 Exhibit 4 Oct. 1 OPM, #5 Exhibit 5 Agency Mandates, #6 Exhibit 6 EO14042, #7 Exhibit 7 Sept. 24 Task Force Contractors, #8 Exhibit 8 Sept. 28 First OMB Rule, #9 Exhibit 9 Sept. 30 FAR Council, #10 Exhibit 10 Nov. 10 Second OMB Rule, #11 Exhibit 11 Nov. 10 Task Force, #12 Exhibit 12 Chretien Affidavit, #13 Exhibit 13 Beebe Affidavit, #14 Exhibit 14 F4MF Affidavit, #15 Exhibit 15 Armbrust Affidavit, #16 Exhibit 16 Ball Affidavit, #17 Exhibit 17 Biggs Affidavit, #18 Exhibit 18 Clark Affidavit, #19 Exhibit 19 Dantuma Affidavit, #20 Exhibit 20 Divilbiss Affidavit, #21 Exhibit 21 Green Affidavit, #22 Exhibit 22 Klosterman Affidavit, #23 Exhibit 23 Lawson Affidavit, #24 Exhibit 24 McComis Affidavit, #25 Exhibit 25 Roberts Affidavit, #26 Exhibit 26 Rucker Reed Affidavit, #27 Exhibit 27 Ryan Affidavit, #28 Exhibit 28 Sams Affidavit, #29 Exhibit 29 Schaecher Affidavit, #30 Exhibit 30 Simpson Affidavit, #31 Exhibit 31 Vrtaric Affidavit, #32 Exhibit 32 Hunter Andrews Affidavit, #33 Proposed Order)(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 12/22/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 84, #85 Exhibit 85, #86 Exhibit 86, #87 Exhibit 87, #88 Exhibit 88, #89 Exhibit 89, #90 Exhibit 90, #91 Exhibit 91, #92 Exhibit 92, #93 Exhibit 93, #94 Exhibit 94, #95 Exhibit 95, #96 Exhibit 96, #97 Exhibit 97, #98 Exhibit 98, #99 Exhibit 99, #100 Exhibit 100, #101 Exhibit 101, #102 Exhibit 102, #103 Exhibit 103, #104 Exhibit 104, #105 Exhibit 105, #106 Exhibit 106, #107 Exhibit 107, #108 Exhibit 108, #109 Exhibit 109, #110 Exhibit 110, #111 Exhibit 111, #112 Exhibit 112, #113 Exhibit 113, #114 Exhibit 114, #115 Exhibit 115, #116 Exhibit 116, #117 Exhibit 117, #118 Exhibit 118, #119 Exhibit 119, #120 Exhibit 120, #121 Exhibit 121, #122 Exhibit 122, #123 Exhibit 123, #124 Exhibit 124, #125 Exhibit 125, #126 Exhibit 126, #127 Exhibit 127, #128 Exhibit 128, #129 Exhibit 129, #130 Exhibit 130, #131 Exhibit 131, #132 Exhibit 132, #133 Exhibit 133, #134 Exhibit 134, #135 Exhibit 135, #136 Exhibit 136, #137 Exhibit 137, #138 Exhibit 138, #139 Exhibit 139, #140 Exhibit 140, #141 Exhibit 141, #142 Exhibit 142, #143 Exhibit 143, #144 Exhibit 144, #145 Exhibit 145, #146 Exhibit 146, #147 Exhibit 147, #148 Exhibit 148, #149 Exhibit 149, #150 Exhibit 150, #151 Exhibit 151, #152 Exhibit 152, #153 Exhibit 153, #154 Exhibit 154, #155 Exhibit 155, #156 Exhibit 156)(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27502819) filed by John Armbrust, N. Anne Atkinson, Julia Badger, Michael Ball, Raymond A. Beebe, Jr., Craigan Biggs, Laura Brunstetter, Mark Canales, Michele Caramenico, Andrew Chamberland, David Clark, Diane Countryman, Kevin Dantuma, Jordan DeManss, Jose Delgado, George Demetriou, Keri Divilbiss, Mercer Dunn IV, Feds for Medical Freedom, William Filkins, Jonathan Gragg, Bryon Green, Thomas David Green, Erika Hebert, Peter Hennemann, Highland Engineering, Inc., Neil Horn, Carey Hunter-Andrews, Tana Johnston, Tyler Klosterman, Deborah Lawson, Dan Lewis, Local 918, American Federation of Government Employees, Melissa Magill, Kendra Ann Marceau, Dalia Matos, Stephen May, Steven McComis, Christopher Miller, Joshua Moore, Brent Moores, Jesse Neugebauer, Joshua Nicely, Leslie Carl Petersen, Patti Rivera, Joshua Roberts, Ashley Rodman, M. LeeAnne Rucker-Reed, Trevor Rutledge, Nevada Ryan, James Charles Sams III, Michael Schaecher, Christina Schaff, Kurtis Simpson, Barrett Smith, Jaci ReNee Smith, Jarod Smith, Jana Spruce, John Tordai, Sandor Vigh, Christine Vrtaric, Pamela Weichel, David Wentz, Jason Wilkerson, Patrick Wright, Patrick Mendoza York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 12/21/2021)
[-] Read Less